Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Hilary L Barnes
Case #: 3:23-bk-50322
Case Filed:May 12, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jun 29, 2023
Claims Deadline:Sep 29, 2023

Debtor
HUGHES PRIVATE CAPITAL, INC.
5440 LOUIE LANE SUITE 106
RENO, NV 89511
Represented By
KEVIN A. DARBY
Darby Law Practice, Ltd
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
MCDONALD CARANO LLP 100 WEST LIBERTY ST., 10TH FLOOR
RENO, NV 89501
Represented By
SALLIE B ARMSTRONG
contact info
Trustee
CHRISTOPHER P. BURKE
CHRISTOPHER BURKE 526 LANDER STREET
RENO, NV 89509
Represented By
ROBERT E. ATKINSON
Atkinson Law Associates Ltd
contact info
ATKINSON LAW ASSOCIATES LTD.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 7
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509


Docket last updated: 03/06/2025 12:43 PM PST
Friday, May 12, 2023
crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Fri 05/12 4:34 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition 7([LINK 23-50322 ) [misc,volp7pb] ( 338.00). Receipt number A21127095, fee amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition 7 Fri 05/12 4:32 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $338. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of HUGHES PRIVATE CAPITAL, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Fri 05/12 4:32 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of HUGHES PRIVATE CAPITAL, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Asset Non-Individual (BNC-auto assignment) Fri 05/12 4:35 PM
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc Request for Special Notice (BK) Fri 05/12 4:59 PM
Request for Special Notice Filed by LOUIS M BUBALA III on behalf of WALTER DUVALL (BUBALA, LOUIS)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs misc Request for Special Notice (BK) Fri 05/12 5:01 PM
Request for Special Notice Filed by LOUIS M BUBALA III on behalf of JACQUELINE HANDLIN, DONALD HANDLIN (BUBALA, LOUIS) Modified on 5/15/2023 for correct party filers (Hammill, IA)
Related: [-]