Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 6:23-mj-01548
Case Filed:May 11, 2023
Terminated:May 16, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 14, 2023 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Nicholas Truglia (1)
Represented By
Erin Brenna Hyde
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Courtney Richardson-Jones
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/11/2024 11:25 PM EST
Thursday, May 11, 2023
1 1 Arrest pursuant to Rule 32.1 of Nicholas Truglia from the Southern District of New York. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price: INITIAL APPEARANCE in Rule 32.1 proceedings held on 5/11/2023 as to Nicholas Truglia from the Southern District of New York. Appearance entered by Erin Brenna Hyde for Nicholas Truglia on behalf of defendant. (DIGITAL) (ECJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nicholas Truglia. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nicholas Truglia. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting 4 Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Nicholas Truglia (1). The Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent the defendant in this District in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 5/11/2023. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Rule 32.1 hearing by Nicholas Truglia. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Nicholas Truglia. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing by USA as to Nicholas Truglia. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORAL ORDER granting 8 Oral Motion to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing as to Nicholas Truglia (1). Rendered in open Court by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 5/11/2023. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Nicholas Truglia. Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 5/16/2023 at 11:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 C before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 5/11/2023. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Nicholas Truglia: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/1/2020. (ECJ)
Related: [-]