Manchanda v. Hays Worldwide LLC et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James C Cacheris |
Referred: | Theresa Carroll Buchanan |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01339 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2014 |
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 4:03 PM EDT |
Defendant
David Hays
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hays Worldwide LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mona Manchanda
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
76 | 76
order
Order
Thu 11/12 11:01 AM
FINAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 11/12/2015. (mpha) |
|
Wednesday, November 11, 2015 | ||
75 | 75
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 11/11 3:36 PM
NOTICE by Mona Manchanda re74 Order,, Submission of Endorsed Proposed Final Order (Curley, Paul) |