Original Case: 1:23-cv-00233

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-00396
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Terminated:May 11, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 14, 2023 4:34 AM EDT
Appellant
Anna Theresa Balash
Represented By
Anna Theresa Balash
-
contact info
Defendant
Yiannakis C. Ioannides
Defendant
John Doe 1-10, The last ten names being fictitious and unknown to the plaintiff, the person or parties intended being the persons or parties, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lieu upon the Mortgage premises described in the Complaint
Plaintiff - Appellee
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for the Holders of the Specialty Underwriting and Residential Finance Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-BCI
Represented By
Todd Falasco
Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2023 4:30 AM EDT
Friday, March 17, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Anna Theresa Balash, FILED. [3488061] [23-396] [Entered: 03/22/2023 05:22 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED
2 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry #9, dated 03/08/2023, RECEIVED.[3488062] [23-396] [Entered: 03/22/2023 05:25 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3488063] [23-396] [Entered: 03/22/2023 05:26 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 4 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Anna Theresa Balash, district court receipt # 100000032, FILED.[3488064] [23-396] [Entered: 03/22/2023 05:28 PM]
Related: [-]