Member Case
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90342

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:23-bk-90522
Case Filed:May 15, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Valley Anesthesiology Consultants, Inc.
1A Burton Hills Boulevard
Nashville, TN 37215
Represented By
Victoria Nicole Argeroplos
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, January 19, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/19 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Final Decree
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
5 5 order Final Decree (No Form) Tue 01/16 8:48 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing that all further reporting concerning the administration of the assets and liabilities in this case will occur only in the case of ED Solutions, LLC, Case No. 23-90367 The docket in Case No. 23-90367 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 1/16/2024. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Creditors) Wed 07/26 11:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by American Express National Bank (Bharatia, Shraddha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/18 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/18/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
Monday, May 15, 2023
2 2 order Joint Administration Mon 05/15 6:18 PM
Order for Joint Administration under 23-90342 Signed on 5/15/2023 (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
1 1 38 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Mon 05/15 2:45 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Valley Anesthesiology Consultants, Inc.. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 06/14/2023 (Argeroplos, Victoria)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 05/15 5:10 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-90522 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24413981. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Mon 05/15 6:19 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 23-90342 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]