Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Michael J Newman
Referred: Peter B Silvain, Jr
Case #: 1:23-cv-00984
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 15, 2023
Case in other court:Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, CV-23-977979
Last checked: Saturday Nov 11, 2023 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
City of Westlake, Ohio
Represented By
James A. Climer
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Amy K. Herman
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Zachary W. Anderson
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder
contact info
Steven K. Kelley
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Dennis M. Clough
Represented By
James A. Climer
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Amy K. Herman
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Zachary W. Anderson
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder
contact info
Steven K. Kelley
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Jasinsky
Represented By
James A. Climer
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Amy K. Herman
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Zachary W. Anderson
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder
contact info
Steven K. Kelley
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Michael P. Maloney
Represented By
James A. Climer
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Amy K. Herman
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Zachary W. Anderson
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder
contact info
Steven K. Kelley
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
William McKissack
Represented By
James S. Jones
Law Office Of James Sidney Jones
contact info

GPO Apr 26 2024
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 37 Motion to extend Discovery Deadlines and Adopt Proposed Amended Case Management Schedule: Non-expert Discovery due by 6/25/2024; Expert Reports for the Party with the Burden of Proof due by 7/25/2024; Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 8/30/2024; Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2024; Teleconference regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Doc. #41) is set for 4/26/24 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B Silvain, Jr. on 4/26/24. (P,Ro)
GPO Apr 26 2024
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Compel: Non-expert Discovery due by 8/26/2024; Expert Reports for the Party with the Burden of Proof due by 9/26/2024; Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 10/30/2024; Expert Discovery due by 12/2/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 1/2/2024; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Doc. #41) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Peter B Silvain, Jr on 4/26/24. (P,Ro)
GPO Aug 26 2024
strate Judge Peter B Silvain, Jr on 8/26/24. (P,Ro)Order Setting Deadlines: Plaintiff's Motion regarding position on the discovery dispute deadline is set for 8/27/24 by 5:00 PM. Defendants' Response deadline to Plaintiff's Motion is set for 8/29/24 by 5:00 PM. Signed by US Magi
GPO Feb 21 2025
ORDER GRANTING 101 Motion to clarify filed by Dennis M. Clough, Michael P. Maloney, City of Westlake, Ohio, Ryan Jasinsky; Expert Discovery ddl is extended to 3/24/2025, for the limited purpose of deposing Plaintiffs use-of-force expert, Scott Hilden. Dispositive Motions ddl is extended to 4/23/2025. Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 2/21/25. (P,Ro)
GPO Apr 11 2025
ORDER granting Joint Motion Requesting Referral to Mediation (Related Doc # 112). Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 4/11/25.(P,Ro)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
136 136 notice Notice (court event) Thu 04/24 2:04 PM
One Flash Drive Containing Exhibits C-3 and C-4 - Front and Rear Dash Body Camera Videos in Support of120 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. (Flash drive placed in file in Clerk's Office.)Related document(s)120 . (L,Br)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
135 135 notice Notice (court event) Thu 04/24 8:49 AM
One Flash Drive containing Exhibits in Support of119 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William McKissack. (Flash drive placed in file in Clerks Office.) Related document(s)119 . (L,Br)
Related: [-]
134 134 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 04/23 7:22 PM
Errata Sheet to Scott Hilden Depo Transcript filed by William McKissack. Related document(s)130 .(Jones, James)
Related: [-]
133 133 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 04/23 7:02 PM
Plaintiff Exhibits to Summary Judgment Motion Manual Filing filed by William McKissack. Related document(s)119 .(Jones, James)
Related: [-]
132 132 trial Deposition (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:33 PM
Deposition of Chief Kevin Bielozer taken on August 23, 2024 filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)131 . (Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
131 131 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:32 PM
Notice of Filing Depo Transcript of Chief Kevin Bielozer filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)120 .(Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
130 130 trial Deposition (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:30 PM
Deposition of Scott Hilden taken on March 17, 2025 filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)129 . (Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
129 129 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:29 PM
Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of Scott Hilden filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)120 .(Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
128 128 trial Deposition (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:28 PM
Deposition of Michael Maloney taken on August 21, 2024 filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)127 . (Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
127 127 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:27 PM
Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of Michael Maloney filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)120 .(Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
126 126 trial Deposition (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:26 PM
Deposition of Petra Thompson taken on June 14, 2024 filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)125 . (Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
125 125 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:24 PM
Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of Petra Thompson filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)120 .(Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
124 124 trial Deposition (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:23 PM
Deposition of Ryan Jasinsky taken on July 25, 2025 filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)123 . (Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
123 123 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:21 PM
Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of Ryan Jasinsky filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)120 .(Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
122 122 trial Deposition (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:20 PM
Deposition of William McKissack taken on June 14, 2024 filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)121 . (Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
121 121 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 04/23 2:18 PM
Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of William McKissack filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky. Related document(s)120 .(Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
120 120 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/23 2:11 PM
Motion for summary judgment filed by City of Westlake, Ohio, Dennis M. Clough, Ryan Jasinsky.(Anderson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - William McKissack Depo Excerpts,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Ryan Jasinsky Depo Excerpts,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Capt Vogel,
Att: 5 Exhibit C-1 - Incident Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit C-2 - Inventory Photo,
Att: 7 Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit C-3 - Dash Cam Video,
Att: 8 Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit C-4 - Dash Cam Video,
Att: 9 Exhibit D - Petra Thompson Depo Excerpts,
Att: 10 Exhibit E - McKissack ED Record 10.18.21,
Att: 11 Exhibit F - Michael Maloney Depo Excerpts,
Att: 12 Exhibit G - McKissack Indictment,
Att: 13 Exhibit H - Criminal Docket,
Att: 14 Exhibit I - Dennis Clough Depo Excerpts,
Att: 15 Exhibit J - Scott Hilden Depo Excerpts,
Att: 16 Exhibit K - Kevin Bielozer Depo Excerpts
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
119 119 motion Summary Judgment Tue 04/22 10:29 PM
Motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff William McKissack.(Jones, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Jasinsky front dash cam video,
Att: 2 Exhibit Jasinsky rear dash cam video,
Att: 3 Exhibit Bielozer Depo Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit Jasinsky Depo Transcript,
Att: 5 Exhibit Dr. Kamal Expert Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit Chief Scott Hilden Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit Excel Spreadsheet/Demonstrative Map of Westlake Arrests,
Att: 8 Exhibit Plaintiff Head Injuries,
Att: 9 Exhibit Anonymous Letter,
Att: 10 Exhibit Police Report for McKissack,
Att: 11 Exhibit Westlake Police Dept 2021 Annual Report,
Att: 12 Exhibit Westlake Police Use of Force Policy,
Att: 13 Exhibit Plaintiff ER Medical Records,
Att: 14 Exhibit Jasinsky Incident Reports,
Att: 15 Exhibit Jasinsky dash cam of Lopez Incident,
Att: 16 Exhibit Babic Incident Report,
Att: 17 Exhibit OPOTO 2016 Requirements,
Att: 18 Exhibit Crenshaw Report on Bielozer,
Att: 19 Exhibit Crenshaw Report on Bullins,
Att: 20 Exhibit Crenshaw Report on Jasinsky,
Att: 21 Exhibit Defendant Response to P 5th Set of RFP,
Att: 22 Exhibit Maloney Depo Transcript,
Att: 23 Exhibit Agonston Depo Transcript,
Att: 24 Exhibit Officer Complaint Incident report,
Att: 25 Exhibit 2nd Officer Complaint Incident Report,
Att: 26 Exhibit 3rd Officer Complaint Incident Report,
Att: 27 Exhibit 4th Officer Complaint Incident Report,
Att: 28 Exhibit 2022 OPOTA pre approval form for 2021 course,
Att: 29 Exhibit WPD Power Point,
Att: 30 Exhibit Article on WPD Use of Force Training,
Att: 31 Exhibit Vogel Depo Transcript,
Att: 32 Exhibit Clough Depo Transcript,
Att: 33 Exhibit Plaintiff Medical Records Summary,
Att: 34 Exhibit Jasinsky Discipline Incident Report,
Att: 35 Exhibit Jasinsky Discipline Follow-up,
Att: 36 Exhibit OPOTO purported Attestation form,
Att: 37 Exhibit Affidavit of Mariah Crenshaw
Monday, April 21, 2025
118 118 minutes ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Order Mon 04/21 10:26 AM
Order for Court-Conducted Mediation with mediation conference to be held on Monday, 6/30/2025 at 10:00 a.m. , via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry. No later than 5:00 p.m. on June 23, 2025, each party shall submit a mediation conference statement in letter form, to Judge Gentry (via email at Gentry_Chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov), with copy to opposing counsel. Mediation statements are not to be filed on the Court's docket. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 4/18/25. (S,HR)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
117 117 1 pgs order Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Fri 04/18 3:43 PM
Order referring case to United States Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry for Mediation in the Southern District of Ohio. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 4/18/2025. (B,DL)
Related: [-]