Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp II
Case #: 3:23-cv-00982
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12131 Americans with Disabilities
Case Filed:May 15, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 11, 2023 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
North Star Bluescope Steel, LLC
6767 County Road 9
Delta, OH 43515
Represented By
Elizabeth L. Bolduc
Eastman & Smith
contact info
Lynn Vuketich Luther
Eastman & Smith - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Underwood
Represented By
Katherine Anne Pawlak Macek
Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg
contact info
Francis J. Landry
Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/16 1:53 PM
Stipulation and Order dismissing case with prejudice. Each party shall bear his/its own costs and attorneys fees. Judge James R. Knepp II on 1/16/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
12 12 notice Stipulation (atty event) Mon 01/15 10:28 AM
Proposed Stipulation and Judgment Entry of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Aaron Underwood. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 11/17 3:30 PM
Minutes of Settlement Conference [non-document] held on 11/17/2023 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff appeared with attorney Francis J. Landry; Defendant appeared with attorney Elizabeth L. Bolduc and Lynn Vuketich Luther. Case settled. Parties to file dismissal entry within 30 days. (Court Reporter: Stacey Kiprotich.) Time: 2 hours. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
11 11 4 pgs order Order Wed 10/18 4:18 PM
Order: Settlement Conference SET for 11/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 318 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted via email to Knepp_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 11/14/2023. Judge James R. Knepp II on 10/18/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 10/18 4:16 PM
Minutes of Telephone Status Conference [non-document] held on 10/18/2023 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff appeared by attorney Francis J. Landry; Defendant appeared by attorney Elizabeth L. Bolduc. Settlement Status Conference SET for 11/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 318 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Order to follow. Time: 10 minutes. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
10 10 order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Thu 08/17 3:57 PM
Minute Order of Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference held via telephone on 8/17/2023 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff appeared by attorney Francis J. Landry; Defendant appeared by attorney Elizabeth L. Bolduc. Case is assigned to proceed on the STANDARD track. Parties to exchange Rule 26(a) disclosures by 9/18/2023. Discovery cut-off dates: Plaintiff's expert disclosures by 11/15/2023; Defendant's expert disclosures by 1/15/2024; Liability by 3/15/2024; Damages by Expert identification and discovery related to damages will be scheduled after summary judgment practice is completed. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 9/30/2023. Dispositive motions by 4/15/2024. Telephone Status Conference SET for 10/18/2023 at 3:00 PM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to parties in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/17/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
9 9 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Tue 08/08 5:03 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Aaron Underwood. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 07/21 2:17 PM
Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L. Bolduc filed by on behalf of North Star Bluescope Steel, LLC. (Bolduc, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
7 7 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Fri 07/14 1:19 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held via telephone on 8/17/2023 at 1:30 PM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/14/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/14 10:48 AM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by North Star Bluescope Steel, LLC. (Luther, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/14 12:40 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Aaron Underwood. North Star Bluescope Steel, LLC waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023 filed on behalf of Aaron Underwood (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
4 4 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 05/15 4:19 PM
Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Aaron Underwood. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 05/15 3:50 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons received. No summons provided. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/15 12:58 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Form AO 239) filed by Plaintiff Aaron Underwood. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/15 12:56 PM
Complaint with jury demand against North Star Bluescope Steel, LLC.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Aaron underwood. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Copy of OCRC/EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Copy of EEOC Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Copy of OCRC Right to Sue,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 05/15 1:17 PM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 05/15 1:18 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Mon 05/15 3:28 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Judge James R. Knepp II on 5/15/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Mon 05/15 3:51 PM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (R,EM)
Related: [-]