Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10664

Mississippi Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jason D Woodard
Case #: 1:23-ap-01017
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:May 14, 2023
Terminated:Feb 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Catherine C. Lowe
1207 Old Lake Cove
Oxford, MS 38655
Represented By
Catherine C. Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
William L Fava
Fava Firm P.O. Box 783
Southaven, MS 38671
Represented By
William L Fava
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:08 PM CDT
Thursday, February 01, 2024
court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/01 9:31 AM
Adversary Proceeding 23-1017 Closed . Entered on Docket by: (AOH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
court Undeliverable Mail Tue 01/30 9:02 AM
Undeliverable Mail Addressed to Catherine C. Lowe, 1207 Old Lake Cove, Oxford, MS 38655: Represented by Sarah Baker Related [+]. Entered on Docket by: (WC)
Related: [-] 16 Order (Generic)
court Undeliverable Mail Tue 01/30 9:03 AM
Undeliverable Mail Addressed to Jason Alan Lowe, 1207 Old Lake Road, Oxford, MS 38655: Represented by Sean Roberts Guy & Douglas C. Noble Related [+]. Entered on Docket by: (WC)
Related: [-] 16 Order (Generic)
Saturday, January 20, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 01/20 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/20/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, January 18, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 01/18 2:46 PM
Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Related [+]. Entered on Docket by: (AOH)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff William L Fava
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 01/18 2:49 PM
1:23-ap-1017: : Disposition of Adversary. Agreed Order of Dismissal with prejudice has been entered. Entered on Docket by: (AOH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
15 15 order Consolidate Case/AP Wed 07/12 4:51 PM
Agreed Order Granting Motion To Consolidate adversary proceedings 22-01018 and 23-01017 Lead case will be 22-01018 Related [+] Entered on Docket by: (AOH)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, July 07, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Service Fri 07/07 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/07/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 misc Stipulation Fri 07/07 4:56 PM
Stipulation Filed by Sarah Baker on behalf of Catherine C. Lowe Related [+]. (Baker, Sarah)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Discovery
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
12 12 court Hearing Set (Document) Wed 07/05 4:59 PM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. The Hearing date is scheduled for 8/9/2023 at 10:30 AM at Oxford Federal Building. Responses due by 7/31/2023. Entered on Docket by: (AOH)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Consolidate Case/AP 23-01017 JDW and 22-01018 JDW filed by Defendant Catherine C. Lowe
Monday, July 03, 2023
11 11 misc Amended Document Mon 07/03 10:40 AM
Amended Document Filed by Sarah Baker on behalf of Catherine C. Lowe Related [+]. (Baker, Sarah)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Consolidate Case/AP filed by Defendant Catherine C. Lowe
10 10 motion Consolidate Case/AP Mon 07/03 10:11 AM
Motion to Consolidate Lead Case22-01018-JDW with Member Case 23-01017 JDW Filed by Sarah Baker on behalf of Catherine C. Lowe. (Baker, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
9 9 order Discovery Fri 06/23 2:15 PM
Order on Discovery . Stipulations Due by 7/7/2023 Entered on Docket by: (AOH)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/23 1:09 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Sarah Baker on behalf of Catherine C. Lowe. (Baker, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 18, 2023
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Service Sun 06/18 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/18/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, June 16, 2023
6 6 order Extend/Shorten Time Fri 06/16 9:05 AM
Agreed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to file a responsive pleading to the complaint. New ddl: 6/29/2023 Related [+] Entered on Docket by: (AOH)
Related: [-] 5
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 06/16 9:06 AM
Per order6 Catherine C. Lowe Answer Deadline Reset for 6/29/2023 . Entered on Docket by: (AOH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
5 5 motion Extend/Shorten Time Thu 06/15 3:29 PM
Motion To Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by Sarah Baker on behalf of Catherine C. Lowe. (Baker, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Service Thu 05/18 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/18/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/16 3:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on Catherine C. Lowe 5/16/2023 .. (Fava, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 05/16 2:45 PM
Summons Issued on Catherine C. Lowe Answer Due 6/15/2023 . Entered on Docket by: (AOH)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 14, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 05/14 12:50 PM
Adversary case 23-01017 (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) : Complaint by William L Fava against Catherine C. Lowe.. (Fava, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet