California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:23-cv-03698
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 15, 2023
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 11, 2023 12:44 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Case Logistics Inc.
Represented By
David Hong
Law Office Of David Hong
contact info
Counter Claimant
Ecomers Marketing, Inc.
Represented By
David Hong
Law Office Of David Hong
contact info
Counter Defendant
BelAir Electronics Inc.
Represented By
Marc Libarle
Law Offices Of Marc Libarle
contact info
Gabriel I. Opatken
Noble Ip PLLC
contact info
Timothy J. Haller
Haller Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Case Logistics Inc.
Represented By
David Hong
Law Office Of David Hong
contact info
Defendant
Ecomers Marketing, Inc.
Represented By
David Hong
Law Office Of David Hong
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Jeffrey G Sheldon
Represented By
Jeffrey G Sheldon
Cislo And Thomas LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BelAir Electronics Inc.
Represented By
Marc Libarle
Law Offices Of Marc Libarle
contact info
Gabriel I. Opatken
Noble Ip PLLC
contact info
Timothy J. Haller
Haller Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
53 53 stip Dismiss Case Wed 07/10 9:52 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff BelAir Electronics Inc..(Haller, Timothy)
Related: [-]