Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mitchell S Goldberg
Case #: 2:23-cv-01789
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 15, 2023
Re-opened:Jul 14, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 11, 2023 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
JBS SOUDERTON INC.
Represented By
BRIAN H. LEINHAUSER
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
ARIEL K. LIERZ
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
RANDI J. WINTER
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
LAURIE ANN FIORE
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
JBS USA HOLDINGS, INC.
Defendant
STEPHANIE VEGA
Represented By
BRIAN H. LEINHAUSER
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
ARIEL K. LIERZ
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
RANDI J. WINTER
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
LAURIE ANN FIORE
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
OUMOU "AMI" THIAM
Represented By
BRIAN H. LEINHAUSER
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
ARIEL K. LIERZ
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
RANDI J. WINTER
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
LAURIE ANN FIORE
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
ADRIAN RAMOS
Represented By
BRIAN H. LEINHAUSER
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
ARIEL K. LIERZ
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
RANDI J. WINTER
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
LAURIE ANN FIORE
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Movant
JOSEPH EMMANUEL WHITE, JR.
Movant
AUSTIN PRINCE
Movant
ALPHONSO E. PRINCE
Movant
ZACKARY E. POPE
Plaintiff
TRACEY PLUMMER
7047 DORCAS STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19111
Plaintiff
JAMES SKINNER
5926 BUSTLETON AVENUE
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19149
Plaintiff
JAMES ROBINSON
190 ROSELYN
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19120
Plaintiff
HERBERT L. ROBINSON
1613 E. COMLY STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19149
Plaintiff
HERBERT ROBINSON, JR.
607 PITTSTON AVENUE
SCRANTON, PA 18505
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY MYERS, JR.
1374 EDGEWOOD AVENUE
ABINGTON, PA 19134
Plaintiff
KAALIYM MUHAMMAD
AND INDIVIDUALS SIMILARLY SITUATED 2458 NB GARNET STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19132
Plaintiff
GREGORY MEGGINSON
7012 BARNETT LANE
ELKRIDGE, MD 21075
Plaintiff
TROY JONES
2341 NORTH 20TH STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19132
Plaintiff
KRISTINA JOHNSON
607 PITTSTON AVENUE
SCRANTON, PA 18505
Plaintiff
ROBERT EDWARDS
426 E. ALLEGHENY AVENUE SUITE 404
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19134
Plaintiff
CURTIS J. BUTTS, JR.
644 E. ONTARIO STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19134
Plaintiff
KAREEM BROWN
7640 GILBERT STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19150


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 30, 2024
61 61 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 09/30 2:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re55 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by JBS SOUDERTON INC.. (LEINHAUSER, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
60 60 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 09/30 10:42 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE (ECF NO. 59), AND THERE BEING GOOD CAUSE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT IS GIVEN LEAVE TO PROMPTLY FILE THE REPLY ANNEXED TO ITS MOTION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/30/2024.9/30/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
59 59 motion Leave to File Document Fri 09/27 2:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of its Partial Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by JBS SOUDERTON INC..Certificate of Service.(LEINHAUSER, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service