Nebraska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas L Saladino
Case #: 8:23-bk-80376
Case Filed:May 15, 2023
Dismissed:Aug 21, 2023
Terminated:Sep 29, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Gunnels & Burtin, LLC
1299 Farnam St Ste 300
Omaha, NE 68102
Represented By
John A. Lentz
Lentz Law, Pc, Llo
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Jerry Jensen
Assistant UST U.S. Trustee's Office 111 South 18th Plz, Suite 1148
Omaha, NE 68102
Represented By
Jerry L. Jensen
Assistant U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 12:02 PM CDT
Thursday, October 12, 2023
34 34 court Clerks Entry Discharging Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Thu 10/12 4:00 PM
Clerk's Entry re:Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee Discharge. The Trustee is discharged and relieved of any further duties. Related [+]. (kks)
Related: [-] 33 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution B-case dism or conv, fee award recd filed by Trustee James A. Overcash
33 33 trustee Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution B-case dism or conv, fee award recd Thu 10/12 2:56 PM
Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $1,000.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 2 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $214417.70, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. (Overcash, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
court Close Bankruptcy Case 9 11 12 Fri 09/29 2:58 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed . (kks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
32 32 order Compensation Wed 09/13 11:32 AM
Order Approving Application For Compensation For James A. Overcash, Chapter 11 SubChapter V Trustee Filed by Trustee James A. Overcash Related [+]. The pleading was filed, served and noticed pursuant to local rules. No timely resistance/objection was filed. The motion is approved. Approving for James A. Overcash, fees awarded: $280.00, expenses awarded: $223.06. The movant must serve notice of this order on all parties in interest affected by the motion or order who did not receive notice via the CM/ECF system, and if any parties were served, the movant must file a certificate of service. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (mpm)
Related: [-] 28
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Wed 08/23 11:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
30 30 notice Certificate of Service Wed 08/23 5:14 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee James A. Overcash Related [+] (Overcash, James)
Related: [-] 28 Application for Compensation filed by Trustee James A. Overcash
29 29 court Non-Compliance Wed 08/23 4:32 PM
Notice of Non-Compliance Related [+]. (kks)
Related: [-] 28 Application for Compensation filed by Trustee James A. Overcash
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
28 28 motion Compensation Tue 08/22 5:36 PM
Application for Compensation for James A. Overcash, Trustee Chapter 11, Fee: $280.00, Expenses: $223.06. Filed by Trustee James A. Overcash 9013 Objections due by 9/12/2023. (Overcash, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
27 27 order Dismiss Case Mon 08/21 11:13 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case for Cause Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b) Filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry Jensen Related [+]. The pleading was filed, served and noticed pursuant to local rules. No timely resistance/objection was filed. The motion is granted. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (mpm)
Related: [-] 21
Monday, August 14, 2023
26 26 order Extend Time Mon 08/14 7:03 AM
Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File the Plan filed by Debtor Gunnels & Burtin, LLC Related [+]. The motion is granted. The deadline to file the plan is extended to August 20, 2023. The movant must serve notice of this order on all parties in interest affected by the motion or order who did not receive notice via the CM/ECF system, and if any parties were served, the movant must file a certificate of service. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk)
Related: [-] 25
Friday, August 11, 2023
25 25 motion Extend Time Fri 08/11 3:43 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Debtor Gunnels & Burtin, LLC Related [+] (Lentz, John)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Gunnels & Burtin, LLC
Saturday, August 05, 2023
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sat 08/05 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
court Courts Certificate Of Mailing (text event) Tue 08/01 11:52 AM
Court's Certificate of Mailing of related document to EBF Holdings, LLC d/b/a Everest Business Funding, Michael W. Davis / DTO Law, 601 S Figueroa St., Ste. 2130, Los Angeles, CA 90017 Related [+] (dkk)
Related: [-] 23 Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline
Monday, July 31, 2023
23 23 court Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline Mon 07/31 4:22 PM
CORRECTED Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/28/2023 at 09:00 AM at Omaha Courtroom-Telephonic Hearing. Objections due by 8/18/2023. (See PDF) (law)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Dismiss for Cause Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b) Filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry Jensen
22 22 court Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline Mon 07/31 11:20 AM
Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 9/6/2023 at 10:00 AM at Lincoln Courtroom-Telephonic Hearing. Objections due by 8/28/2023. (See PDF) (dkk)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Dismiss for Cause Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b) Filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry Jensen
Friday, July 28, 2023
21 21 motion Dismiss Case Fri 07/28 4:46 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Cause Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b) Filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry Jensen (Jensen, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
trustee Meeting of Creditors Held Wed 06/28 11:58 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held on June 28, 2023 Related [+] (Jensen, Jerry)
Related: [-] Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors (no pdf) filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry Jensen
Monday, June 26, 2023
20 20 audio Mon 06/26 3:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/26/2023 9:09:08 AM ]. File Size [ 2778 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:34 ]. (CRTclerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Administrative Order Text Only Mon 06/26 9:46 AM
Order Related [+]. Status hearing held June 26, 2023. John Lentz appeared for Debtor. James Overcash, Ch. 11 Trustee appeared. Jerry Jensen appeared for U.S. Trustee. Status hearing held. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Salaldino. (Text only order) (dkk)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Gunnels & Burtin, LLC
Friday, June 23, 2023
trustee Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors (no pdf) Fri 06/23 12:01 PM
Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued Related [+] 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/28/2023 at 09:00 AM BY PHONE. (Jensen, Jerry)
Related: [-] 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Corporation filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry Jensen
Monday, June 12, 2023
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 06/12 4:38 PM
Status Report Filed by John A. Lentz on behalf of Gunnels & Burtin, LLC. Related [+] (Lentz, John)
Related: [-] 11 Hearing Set (SubChapter V)
Thursday, June 08, 2023
17 17 notice Certificate of Service Thu 06/08 1:29 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gunnels & Burtin, LLC Related [+] (Lentz, John)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Application to Employ
Att: 1 Order Mailing Matrix
16 16 order Employ Thu 06/08 1:15 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ John A. Lentz as Debtor's Attorney Filed by Debtor Gunnels & Burtin, LLC Related [+]. The application to employ is approved subject to the following: This order is not a determination that the services are necessary and this order does not allow fees. The person or entity employed under this order must file a fee application in accordance with the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures. See Fed. R. Bank. P. 2016, 2017 and 11 U.S.C. 329, 330. Applicant must also comply with Neb. R. Bankr. P. 2016. The allowance of fees is subject to objection and to applicable laws governing allowance of fees. The movant must serve notice of this order on all parties in interest affected by the motion or order and must file a certificate of service. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order). (drs)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 2 pgs motion Employ Thu 06/08 9:30 AM
Application to Employ John A. Lentz as Debtor's Attorney Filed by Debtor Gunnels & Burtin, LLC (Lentz, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Proposed Attorney
Att: 2 Mailing Matrix
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
14 14 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 05/23 12:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Katherine A Rehan on behalf of Lund Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] han, Katherine
Friday, May 19, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 05/19 11:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Corporation filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry Jensen
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
12 12 notice Certificate of Service Wed 05/17 10:13 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gunnels & Burtin, LLC Related [+] (Lentz, John)
Related: [-] 8 Ch 11 SubV Order to Debtor Re:Deposit (ADI)
11 11 court Hearing Set (SubChapter V) Wed 05/17 10:05 AM
Hearing Set (SubChapter V) Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 6/26/2023 at 09:00 AM at Omaha Courtroom-Telephonic Hearing. Status Report due by 6/12/2023. (See PDF) (law)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Gunnels & Burtin, LLC
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
10 10 trustee UST Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Corporation Tue 05/16 4:12 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/23/2023 at 11:45 AM BY PHONE. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 8/22/2023. Proofs of Claims due by 7/24/2023. (Jensen, Jerry)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs trustee Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Tue 05/16 4:10 PM
Notice to Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee. Trustee Appointed: James A. Overcash(Jensen, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee
8 8 order Ch 11 SubV Order to Debtor Re:Deposit (ADI) Tue 05/16 12:40 PM
Order to Debtor. The debtor in a case under Subchapter V of Chapter 11 must pay the trustee an advance fee and expense deposit within five days after the petition is filed and each month thereafter until a Subchapter V plan is confirmed. The amount to be paid is stated in Appendix H. See Neb. R. Bankr. P. 3020-1. ORDERED by Judge Thomas Saladino (Text Only Order) (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
7 7 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 05/15 3:24 PM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by John A. Lentz on behalf of Gunnels & Burtin, LLC . EXTRACTED FROM #1 TO PROPERLY REFLECT ON THE DOCKET. (kks)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Amended Voluntary Petition Mon 05/15 2:50 PM
Amended Voluntary Petition To Designate Subchapter V and Small Business Classifications Filed by John A. Lentz on behalf of Gunnels & Burtin, LLC. Related [+] (Lentz, John)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Gunnels & Burtin, LLC
5 5 misc Support Document Mon 05/15 2:29 PM
Support Document Re: P&L Filed by John A. Lentz on behalf of Gunnels & Burtin, LLC. (Lentz, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 trustee UST Entry of Appearance Mon 05/15 2:28 PM
UST Entry of Appearance Filed by Jerry L. Jensen on behalf of Jerry Jensen. (Jensen, Jerry)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Tax Documents Mon 05/15 2:27 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2021 (this document is not available on public docket) Filed by John A. Lentz on behalf of Gunnels & Burtin, LLC. (Lentz, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 05/15 2:19 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-80376 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A8971704, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 37 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 05/15 2:18 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V due by 08/13/2023. Filed by John A. Lentz of Lentz Law, PC, LLO on behalf of Gunnels & Burtin, LLC.(Lentz, John) DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO REFLECT DEBTOR TO BE A SMALL BUSINESS SUBCHAPTER V CASE. DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO FIX DEADLINES. Modified on 5/15/2023 (kks)
Related: [-]