Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-52488

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:C Kathryn Preston
Case #: 2:23-ap-02025
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:May 15, 2023
Terminated:Sep 26, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ohio Attorney General
Consumer Protection Section 30 East Broad Street Rhodes State Office Tower 14th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Ohio Department of Job & Family Services
PO Box 182212
Columbus, OH 43218
Represented By
Ohio Department of Job & Family Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Latalya Nealey
5001 Calico Ct.
Hilliard, OH 43026
Represented By
Shannon Latalya Nealey
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/26 3:05 PM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-2025 Closed (pjr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 02, 2023
9 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sun 09/03 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 09/02/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)8 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service
Thursday, August 31, 2023
8 8 court Transmission of Document to BNC for Service Thu 08/31 2:01 PM
Transmission of Document to BNC for Service Related [+] (mme)
Related: [-] 7 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
7 7 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/31 1:03 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding for Failure to Prosecute Case (mme)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 08/23 5:41 PM
Proceeding Memo: 08/23/23 Status conference held. Related [+] Plaintiff did not appear. Telephonic appearance by Kristin Radwanick on behalf of Ohio Attorney General. Case will be dismiss. Order from Court. (ao)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Shannon Latalya Nealey
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
6 6 BNC Certificate of Mailing - BNC Thu 08/03 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/02/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)5 Hearing (Adv Other) Set
Monday, July 31, 2023
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 07/31 12:09 PM
Notice of Status Conference Related [+] Status Conference to be held on 8/23/2023 at 03:30 PM Columbus Conference Room 4th Floor for1 . (ao)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Shannon Latalya Nealey
Monday, July 24, 2023
4 4 answer Response Thu 07/27 10:59 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Shannon Latalya Nealey (pjr)
Related: [-] 2 Order of Proposed Dismissal
Sunday, July 09, 2023
3 3 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Mon 07/10 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 07/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)2 Order of Proposed Dismissal
Thursday, July 06, 2023
2 2 order Proposed Dismissal Fri 07/07 9:17 AM
Order Proposing Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Objections Due: 7/28/2023. (kam)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/15 2:20 PM
Adversary case 2:23-ap-02025. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint by Shannon Latalya Nealey against Ohio Attorney General , Ohio Department of Job & Family Services . Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount of $ 0.00 is Exempt (kas)
Related: [-]