District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Tanya S Chutkan
Case #: 1:23-cv-01393
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:May 17, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Monday Nov 13, 2023 4:14 AM EST
Defendant
ANTONY J. BLINKEN
Represented By
Erika Kirstie Oblea
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
KRISTINA KVIEN
Represented By
Erika Kirstie Oblea
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
NASRIN AHMADI
Represented By
Jesse Matthew Bless
Bless Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
REZVANEH BABAAHMADI
Represented By
Jesse Matthew Bless
Bless Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHAMMADREZA CHAGHOMI ABYAZANI
Represented By
Jesse Matthew Bless
Bless Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
MASOUD DEYLAMI
Represented By
Jesse Matthew Bless
Bless Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
SEYYED SOROOSH FIROOZABADI
Represented By
Jesse Matthew Bless
Bless Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
MOEIN LATIFINOWSOUD
Represented By
Jesse Matthew Bless
Bless Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
MOSTAFA MOLAEI MOEIN
Represented By
Jesse Matthew Bless
Bless Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHAMMAD REZA ROSTAMIAN
Represented By
Jesse Matthew Bless
Bless Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHAMMADHASSAN SHIRAZI
Represented By
Jesse Matthew Bless
Bless Litigation
contact info

GPO Jan 16 2025
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: Defendants' 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 01/16/2025. (lcc)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 01/16 11:58 AM
ORDER granting Defendants'7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 01/16/2025.(lcc)
Related: [-]
19 19 10 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 01/16 11:57 AM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: Defendants'7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 01/16/2025. (lcc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
order .Order Thu 11/07 12:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs'13 and18 Notices of Voluntary Dismissals, Plaintiffs Masoud Deylami, Mohammad Reza Rostamian, Mohammadreza Chaghomi Abyazani, Nasrin Ahmadi, Mostafa Molaei Moein, Seyyed Soroosh Firoozabadi, Moein Latifinowsoud, Rezvaneh Babaahmadi are hereby DISMISSED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/7/24. (lcdh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Tue 11/05 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re MOEIN LATIFINOWSOUD and REZVANEH BABAAHMADI by MOEIN LATIFINOWSOUD, REZVANEH BABAAHMADI (Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
17 17 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Wed 07/31 2:40 PM
RESPONSE re16 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by REZVANEH BABAAHMADI, MOEIN LATIFINOWSOUD, MOHAMMADHASSAN SHIRAZI. (Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Tue 07/30 5:58 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, KRISTINA KVIEN (Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 05/24 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ANTONY J. BLINKEN, KRISTINA KVIEN. Attorney Sean Michael Tepe terminated. (Tepe, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
14 14 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 04/15 3:20 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order to Show Cause,,,, Case Stayed,,, filed by REZVANEH BABAAHMADI, MOEIN LATIFINOWSOUD, MOHAMMADHASSAN SHIRAZI.(Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mohammadhassan Shirazi Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Moein Latifinowsoud Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Rezvaneh Babaahmadi Declaration
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Tue 03/19 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Six Individual Plaintiffs: MASOUD DEYLAMI, MOHAMMAD REZA ROSTAMIAN, MOHAMMADREZA CHAGHOMI ABYAZANI, NASRIN AHMADI, MOSTAFA MOLAEI MOEIN, and SEYYED SOROOSH FIROOZABADI (Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Case Stayed Thu 03/14 3:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The1 Complaint states that "Plaintiffs will lose the ability to enter the United States... without immediate action on their pending visa applications prior to August 2023." That time passed more than six months ago. It appears that that this case may therefore be moot because "the issues presented are no longer live or the parties lack a legally cognizable interest in the outcome." Powell v. McCormack, 395 U.S. 486, 496 (1969). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that by April 15, 2024, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed as moot. Defendants may file any response to Plaintiffs' submission within fourteen days of its filing. In the meantime, it is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/13/2024. (lca)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/27 7:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of All Defendants (Tepe, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
11 11 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 08/18 12:42 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, KRISTINA KVIEN.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joseph F. Carilli, Jr
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/09 4:59 AM
Set/Reset Deadline: Defendants' Reply in support of its7 Motion to Dismiss is due by 8/18/2023. (jth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/08 9:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Denying as moot8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and granting10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendants' Reply is due on August 18, 2023. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/8/23. (lcsr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/01 4:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, KRISTINA KVIEN.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 31, 2023
9 9 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 07/31 8:54 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re7 Motion to Dismiss filed by NASRIN AHMADI, REZVANEH BABAAHMADI, MOHAMMADREZA CHAGHOMI ABYAZANI, MASOUD DEYLAMI, SEYYED SOROOSH FIROOZABADI, MOEIN LATIFINOWSOUD, MOSTAFA MOLAEI MOEIN, MOHAMMAD REZA ROSTAMIAN, MOHAMMADHASSAN SHIRAZI.(Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 24, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/24 5:00 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss by NASRIN AHMADI, REZVANEH BABAAHMADI, MOHAMMADREZA CHAGHOMI ABYAZANI, MASOUD DEYLAMI, SEYYED SOROOSH FIROOZABADI, MOEIN LATIFINOWSOUD, MOSTAFA MOLAEI MOEIN, MOHAMMAD REZA ROSTAMIAN, MOHAMMADHASSAN SHIRAZI.(Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 17, 2023
7 7 motion Dismiss Mon 07/17 4:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, KRISTINA KVIEN.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/17 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of ANTONY J. BLINKEN, KRISTINA KVIEN (Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/10 9:01 AM
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan as the case is not related. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
order .Order Fri 07/07 9:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Having considered Plaintiffs'5 response to the court's Minute Order to Show Cause, the court finds that this matter is not "related" to Mosavi v. Kvien, 23-cv-1214 (APM), as it does not "involve common issues of fact." See LCvR 40.5(a)(3). Unreasonably delay claims are inherently fact dependent. See Mashpee Wampanoag Tribal Council, Inc. v. Norton, 336 F.3d 1094, 1100 (D.C. Cir. 2003) ("Resolution of a claim of unreasonable delay is ordinarily a complicated and nuanced task requiring consideration of the particular facts and circumstances before the court."). Accordingly, the mere fact that Plaintiffs' visa claims all arise from inaction by the same embassy does not make them "related" for purposes of Local Civil Rule 40.5(a)(3). Accordingly, the court hereby directs that this matter be transferred to the Calendar Committee for random reassignment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/7/2023. (lcapm2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
5 5 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 07/06 3:36 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order,, Corrected Document filed by NASRIN AHMADI, REZVANEH BABAAHMADI, MOHAMMADREZA CHAGHOMI ABYAZANI, MASOUD DEYLAMI, SEYYED SOROOSH FIROOZABADI, MOEIN LATIFINOWSOUD, MOSTAFA MOLAEI MOEIN, MOHAMMAD REZA ROSTAMIAN, MOHAMMADHASSAN SHIRAZI. (Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 07/06 3:18 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order,, filed by NASRIN AHMADI, REZVANEH BABAAHMADI, MOHAMMADREZA CHAGHOMI ABYAZANI, MASOUD DEYLAMI, SEYYED SOROOSH FIROOZABADI, MOEIN LATIFINOWSOUD, MOSTAFA MOLAEI MOEIN, MOHAMMAD REZA ROSTAMIAN, MOHAMMADHASSAN SHIRAZI. (Bless, Jesse) Modified on 7/6/2023. Counsel has refiled said pleading at Docket Entry5 (zed)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
order .Order Mon 06/26 9:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs shall show cause by July 7, 2023, why this matter should not be reassigned to another judge as it does not appear to be related to Mosavi v. Kvien, 23-cv-1214. It is not apparent to this court how this matter "involve[s] common issues of fact," LCvR 40.5(a)(3), with the Mosavi matter when the "unreasonable delay" claim asserted by each Plaintiff is fact dependent, see Mashpee Wampanoag Tribal Council, Inc. v. Norton, 336 F.3d 1094, 1100 (D.C. Cir. 2003) ("Resolution of a claim of unreasonable delay is ordinarily a complicated and nuanced task requiring consideration of the particular facts and circumstances before the court."). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/26/2023. (lcapm3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 05/17 10:56 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ANTONY J. BLINKEN, KRISTINA KVIEN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Wed 05/17 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:23-cv-1214-APM Mosavi, et al., v. Kvien, et al.. (Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/17 9:38 AM
COMPLAINT against ANTONY J. BLINKEN, KRISTINA KVIEN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10073685) filed by NASRIN AHMADI, MOHAMMAD REZA ROSTAMIAN, MOSTAFA MOLAEI MOEIN, SEYYED SOROOSH FIROOZABADI, MOEIN LATIFINOWSOUD, REZVANEH BABAAHMADI, MOHAMMADHASSAN SHIRAZI, MASOUD DEYLAMI, MOHAMMADREZA CHAGHOMI ABYAZANI.(Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons KVIEN,
Att: 3 Summons BLINKEN,
Att: 4 Summons USAG,
Att: 5 Summons USAO
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/17 10:54 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcb)
Related: [-]