Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Cj Williams
Referred: Mark A Roberts
Case #: 1:23-cv-00034
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:May 17, 2023
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Case in other court:Linn County District Court, LACV102087
Last checked: Monday Nov 13, 2023 3:14 AM CST
Defendant
Red Star Yeast Company, LLC
Represented By
Samantha Kuntz
Lynch Dallas PC
contact info
Wilford H Stone
Lynch Dallas PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian McClintock
Represented By
Thomas D Wolle
Simmons Perrine Moyer Bergman PLC
contact info
Thomas D. Wolle
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, March 01, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/01 11:08 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Joint) by Red Star Yeast Company, LLC (Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/01 11:11 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to18 Stipulation of Dismissal (jag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 02/06 4:01 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/29/2024. Motions due by 3/22/2024. All other deadlines remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 2/6/2024. (kms)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 02/06 1:51 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines of Discovery and Dispositive Motions by Defendant Red Star Yeast Company, LLC (Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
15 15 order Trial Management Order Fri 06/23 9:35 AM
TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2024 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2024 09:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing before Judge CJ Williams. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/2/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2024 08:30 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 6/23/2023. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/22 2:32 PM
FIRST AMENDED ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand to Complaint by Red Star Yeast Company, LLC.(jag)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 06/22 2:27 PM
ORDER granting10 Unresisted Motion to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach and separately file Defendant's First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/22/2023. (jag)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Thu 06/22 11:41 AM
SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 7/14/2023 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 8/15/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2023. Plaintiff's Expert Witness due by 9/15/2023. Defendant's Expert Witnesses due by 11/15/2023. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 12/15/2023. Discovery due by 2/15/2024. Motions due by 3/15/2024. Trial Ready Deadline 8/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/22/2023. (kms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
11 11 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 06/22 11:39 AM
MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 6/20/2023. Scheduling order and discovery plan to follow. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (kms)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Amend/Correct Tue 06/20 3:10 PM
UNRESISTED MOTION to Amend5 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to3 Complaint by Defendant Red Star Yeast Company, LLC (Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Amended Answer
Thursday, June 08, 2023
9 9 order Hearings (Setting/Resetting) Thu 06/08 9:25 AM
ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2023 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/8/2023. (pac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
8 8 order Protective Order Wed 06/07 3:35 PM
PROTECTIVE Order granting7 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/7/2023. (jag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
7 7 motion Protective Order Tue 06/06 11:34 AM
JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Red Star Yeast Company, LLC (Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Tue 06/06 11:31 AM
PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Defendant Red Star Yeast Company, LLC (Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/31 11:07 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand to3 Complaint by Red Star Yeast Company, LLC.(Stone, Wilford) Modified to add text and link on 5/31/2023 (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
4 4 misc Docket Annotation Thu 05/18 9:35 AM
DOCKET Annotation: Please see the new civil case removal packet attached (jlh)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc STATE Court Petition Thu 05/18 9:33 AM
STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Brian McClintock (jlh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/18 8:17 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Red Star Yeast Company, LLC (Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 05/18 9:23 AM
Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 05/17 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Removal from Linn, case number LACV102087. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3924464), filed by Red Star Yeast Company, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 7/17/2023 (Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Local Rule 81 Statement