Arizona District Court
Judge:Steven P Logan
Case #: 2:23-cv-00868
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:May 17, 2023
Terminated:Oct 18, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 13, 2023 2:13 AM MST
Defendant
Federal Savings Bank
Represented By
Chad Hunter Conelly
Conelly Law Group PLLC
contact info
Daniel S Hefter
Hefter Law Limited
contact info
Plaintiff
Erika Shelton
Represented By
Elliot Spencer Isaac
Elliot S Isaac PC
contact info
Florence M Bruemmer
Law Office Of Florence M Bruemmer PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
12 12 7 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/18 1:47 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/17/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/07 2:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:8 MOTION to Stay filed by Federal Savings Bank.(Conelly, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS
Monday, July 31, 2023
10 10 misc Notice of Errata Mon 07/31 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Errata re:8 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Federal Savings Bank..(Conelly, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/31 2:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:8 MOTION to Stay filed by Erika Shelton.(Bruemmer, Florence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B
Monday, July 17, 2023
8 8 motion Stay Mon 07/17 3:56 PM
MOTION to Stay by Federal Savings Bank.(Conelly, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS,
Att: 2 Proposed Order ORDER
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/17 3:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Federal Savings Bank.(Conelly, Chad)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 07/17 4:08 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel S Hefter on behalf of Defendant Federal Savings Bank. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
6 6 service Summons Submitted Service Executed Mon 05/22 3:48 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Erika Shelton, SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Erika Shelton: re: Complaint, Summons upon Daniel S. Hefter, attorney for Defendant on 5/18/23. (Bruemmer, Florence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
5 5 5 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 05/18 8:27 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court no later than August 15, 2023. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/17/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 05/17 3:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Federal Savings Bank. (MCO)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Wed 05/17 3:43 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21918815. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-868-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Wed 05/17 3:42 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Erika Shelton. (Bruemmer, Florence) (MCO)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/17 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21918815 filed by Erika Shelton. (Bruemmer, Florence)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet