Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Joseph H Mckinley, Jr
Case #: 5:23-cv-00073
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 18, 2023
Terminated:Nov 15, 2023
Defendant
Calloway County
Defendant
Calloway County Jail
Defendant
Christy Wathom
Defendant
Jimmy Lee Scott
Defendant
Ken Claud
Defendant
Lt. Black
Defendant
Lt. Mcustion
Defendant
Penny Stein
Defendant
Sheila Peek
Defendant
Supervisor Mike
Defendant
Supervisor Thomas
Defendant
West KY Correctional Healthcare
Plaintiff
Anthony Cain
Plaintiff
Jeffery Johnson

GPO Nov 15 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/14/2023: The Court will enter a separate Order dismissing this action for the reasons set forth herein.cc: Plaintiff, pro se (EAS)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
40 40 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Wed 03/13 11:42 AM
ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/13/2024 denying39 second motion for reinstatement of this case. Plaintiff is WARNED that any future motions he files in this closed action that pertain to mail fraud by CCJ officials will be summarily denied. cc: Plaintiff, pro se(EAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
39 39 motion Reopen Case Mon 03/11 5:03 PM
MOTION to Reinstate Case by Plaintiff Anthony Cain (EAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, March 07, 2024
38 38 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Reopen Case Thu 03/07 2:05 PM
ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/7/2024: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for reinstatement of this case37 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for a copy of "the entire file" for this case37 is DENIED. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (EAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
37 37 motion Miscellaneous Relief Reopen Case Mon 01/22 3:27 PM
MOTION for copy of the entire file, MOTION for immediate reinstatement of this case by Plaintiff Anthony Cain (EAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Ruling Wed 01/03 3:05 PM
ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/3/2024 denying35 Motion for Immediate Ruling. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (EAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
35 35 motion Ruling Tue 01/02 11:49 AM
MOTION for Immediate Ruling on the Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Anthony Cain (EAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
34 34 misc Letter Wed 12/13 4:10 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Anthony Cain. (EAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
33 33 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/15 11:25 AM
ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/14/2023: IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. This is a final Order. The Court certifies that an appeal in forma pauperis would be frivolous and therefore would not be taken in good faith.cc: Plaintiff, pro se (EAS)
Related: [-]
32 32 10 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 11/15 11:20 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/14/2023: The Court will enter a separate Order dismissing this action for the reasons set forth herein.cc: Plaintiff, pro se (EAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
31 31 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/08 3:03 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jimmy Lee Scott, Penny Stein, Sheila Peek, Christy Wathom, West KY Correctional Healthcare, Calloway County, filed by Anthony Cain. (EAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
Thursday, November 02, 2023
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/02 5:05 PM
NOTICE of filing Attachment to Amended Complaint by Anthony Cain re29 Supplement,19 Amended Complaint (EAS)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Supplement Thu 11/02 5:03 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT re19 Amended Complaint by Anthony Cain. (EAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
28 28 misc Letter Wed 11/01 3:58 PM
Letter from Plaintiff. (EAS)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order - TEXT ONLY Wed 11/01 3:08 PM
TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/1/2023: Pursuant to Order entered 11/1/202326 , the Clerk is directed to change the caption of the instant case to "Cain v. Scott al." This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (EAS)
Related: [-]
26 26 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Supplement Wed 11/01 2:29 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/1/2023: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days of entry of this Memorandum and Order which contains all of the claims Plaintiff's seeks to bring in this action against Calloway County Jail (CCJ) officials that occurred prior to 9/5/2023, when Plaintiff filed a subsequent action in this Court regarding his conditions of confinement at CCJ. The second amended complaint will supersede, i.e., replace, the pleadings set forth above1 ,12 ,17 ,18 , and19 and the Court will conduct an initial review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A of the second amended complaint only. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to supplement12 is denied as moot. Plaintiff is warned that if he fails to timely file a second amended complaint, the Court will dismiss this action for failure to comply with an Order of the Court. Plaintiff is further advised that he shall not file any other document in this action until the Court has conducted an initial review of the second amended complaint. If Plaintiff files such a document, it will not be addressed by the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form with this case number and the words "Second Amended Complaint" written in the caption so that he may comply with this Order. IT ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions filed at8 ,21 , and22 are denied. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion23 is denied as moot. Moreover, to the extent that Plaintiff requests relief concerning Plaintiff's other cases in these filings, those requests must be addressed in each of those cases and are denied herein. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion10 is granted, and the Clerk of Court is directed to change Plaintiff's name in the docket sheet to Anthony Cain, also known as Jeffery Johnson. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not put multiple case numbers on any new motion he files in this action; each motion must contain this case number only. Plaintiff is warned that any future motion Plaintiff files in this action with more than one case number will be denied. cc: Plaintiff, pro se, w/ 1983 form (EAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
25 25 misc Letter Mon 10/23 5:07 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Jeff Johnson. (EAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
24 24 misc Letter Fri 10/06 3:31 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Jeff Johnson (EAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/05 3:21 PM
MOTION for Court order by Plaintiff Jeffery Johnson (EAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/22 2:13 PM
MOTION for CCJ to supply the Court, US Marshal address for Jimmy Lee Scott by Plaintiff Jeff Johnson (EAS)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/22 2:12 PM
MOTION for Court order by Plaintiff Jeff Johnson (EAS)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Letter Thu 09/21 4:10 PM
Letter from Anthony Cain requesting docket sheet copies of all cases. (DJT)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/28 3:28 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jimmy Lee Scott, filed by Jeff Johnson. (EAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Envelope
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/28 3:22 PM
DECLARATION by Jeff Johnson (EAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, August 25, 2023
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/25 3:44 PM
DECLARATION by Jeff Johnson (EAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration
Friday, August 18, 2023
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/18 2:32 PM
ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EBOC) on 8/18/2023 granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Finance USDC WDKY; CCJ, Attn: Inmate Accts(EAS)
Related: [-]
utility Schedules Fri 08/18 2:37 PM
Schedules Initial Review due by 12/18/2023. (EAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
15 15 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 08/16 12:37 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re14 Order (EAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter from Jailer Kenneth Claud
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/09 12:30 PM
ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/8/2023: Upon review of Plaintiff' amended complaint12 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's prior Order6 is VACATED. A review of the application to proceed without prepayment of fees2 , however, reveals that it is incomplete. IT IS ORDERED that, within 14 days of entry of this Order, the Calloway County Jailer shall ensure that a certified copy of Plaintiffs jail trust account statement for the past six months is mailed to this Court. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Finance USDC WDKY; Calloway County Jailer (EAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
13 13 misc Letter Fri 06/23 4:28 PM
Letter from Jeffery Johnson. (DJT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
12 12 motion Supplement Fri 06/09 5:24 PM
MOTION to Supplement1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Jeff Johnson (EAS)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Fri 06/09 5:18 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeff Johnson by Jeff Johnson. (EAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Notice of Deficiency
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/09 5:15 PM
NOTICE by Jeff Johnson (EAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order Name Change
9 9 misc Letter Fri 06/09 4:19 PM
Letter by Jeffery Johnson requesting docket sheet. Docket sheet mailed 6/9/2023. (JWM)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/09 4:13 PM
MOTION by Plaintiff Jeffery Johnson, pro se (JWM)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Fri 06/09 3:59 PM
Letter from Jeffery Johnson requesting docket sheet. Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff this date. (KJA)
Related: [-]
respm Response Fri 06/09 5:22 PM
RESPONSE to re4 Notice on Summons filed by Jeff Johnson. Tendered summonses attached to DN1 . (EAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/01 11:40 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 5/31/2023 denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the requisite $402 filing fee within 30 days of entry of this Order. The Clerk is directed to open an account for the payment of the filing fee. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Financial Section USDC WDKY(EAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
5 5 notice Deficiency Thu 05/18 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency re1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Missing Prisoner Trust Account Statement and/or filing fee to be paid in full. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/20/2023. (CDL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/18 5:35 PM
NOTICE ON SUMMONS re1 Complaint - incomplete summons tendered. (CDL)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assignment Thu 05/18 5:32 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley Jr. (CDL)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/18 5:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeff Johnson. (CDL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/18 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Lt. Black, Calloway County Jail, Ken Claud, Lt. Mcustion, Supervisor Mike, Jimmy Lee Scott, Penny Stein, Supervisor Thomas, (No Filing Fee Paid), filed by Jeff Johnson. (CDL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint Pt 2 of 2,
Att: 2 Summons Tendered