Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Ray Kent
Case #: 1:23-cv-00525
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 18, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2023 5:44 AM EST
defendant
Thomas Jeitschko
Represented By
Elizabeth M. Watza
Michigan State University
contact info
defendant
Judith Whipple
Represented By
Elizabeth M. Watza
Michigan State University
contact info
defendant
Amy Wisner
Represented By
Hannah Rose Brefeld
Collins Einhorn Farrell PC
contact info
Trent B. Collier
Collins Einhorn Farrell PC
contact info
Deborah A. Lujan
Collins Einhorn Farrell PC
contact info
plaintiff
Nathan Barbieri
Represented By
Tyson Charles Langhofer
Alliance Defending Freedom (va)
contact info
Paul Logan Spena
Alliance Defending Freedom (va)
contact info
plaintiff
Nolan Radomski
Represented By
Tyson Charles Langhofer
Alliance Defending Freedom (va)
contact info
Paul Logan Spena
Alliance Defending Freedom (va)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, October 09, 2023
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/09 11:00 AM
REPLY to response to motion25 to Dismiss filed by Amy Wisner (Collier, Trent)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
30 30 respm Response in Opposition Mon 09/25 8:07 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss 25 filed by Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski (Spena, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 09/11 4:43 PM
REPLY to response to motion15 to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Thomas Jeitschko, Judith Whipple (Watza, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
28 28 respm Response in Opposition Mon 08/28 7:53 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss 15 filed by Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski (Spena, Paul)
Related: [-]
27 27 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Mon 08/28 4:57 PM
OPINION AND ORDER denying2 motion for preliminary injunction; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Mon 08/28 12:19 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss 25 filed by Amy Wisner (Collier, Trent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit Late Drops, Adds and Section Changes
25 25 motion Dismiss Mon 08/28 12:15 PM
MOTION to dismiss by defendant Amy Wisner; (Collier, Trent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
24 24 misc Exhibit Thu 08/17 9:10 AM
EXHIBIT 1 re22 The Rebellion orgs and causes supported by plaintiffs Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski (Spena, Paul) Modified text on 8/17/2023 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 08/16 10:46 PM
REPLY to response to motion2 by Defendant Wisner filed by Nolan Radomski (Spena, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - The Rebellion orgs and causes supported
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 08/16 10:17 PM
REPLY to response to motion2 by Defendant Wisner filed by Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski (Spena, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Nathan Barbieri,
Att: 2 Declaration of Nolan Radomski
Monday, August 14, 2023
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/14 7:32 PM
REPLY to response to motion2 by Defendants Jeitschko and Whipple filed by Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski (Spena, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Emails re: preliminary relief
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
20 20 service Proof of Service Wed 08/02 3:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Amy Wisner re Response to Motion18 , Response to Motion,19 Brief in Support (Lujan, Deborah)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response to Motion Wed 08/02 3:25 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION for preliminary injunction 2 Brief in Support filed by Amy Wisner (Lujan, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F
18 18 respm Response to Motion Wed 08/02 3:19 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION for preliminary injunction 2 filed by Amy Wisner (Lujan, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
17 17 respm Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence Mon 07/31 10:24 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss 15 filed by Thomas Jeitschko, Judith Whipple (Watza, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Mon 07/31 10:22 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss 15 filed by Thomas Jeitschko, Judith Whipple (Watza, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 07/31 10:21 PM
MOTION to dismiss by defendants Thomas Jeitschko, Judith Whipple; (Watza, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response to Motion Mon 07/31 10:18 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION for preliminary injunction 2 filed by Thomas Jeitschko, Judith Whipple (Watza, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Wed 07/26 5:10 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants Thomas Jeitschko and Judith Whipple to file responsive pleading and response to motion for preliminary injunction extended to 7/31/2023; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
12 12 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Thu 07/20 1:16 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by defendants Thomas Jeitschko, Judith Whipple (Watza, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 07/06 4:09 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Deborah A. Lujan on behalf of defendant Amy Wisner (Lujan, Deborah)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 07/06 4:11 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Hannah Rose Brefeld on behalf of defendant Amy Wisner (Brefeld, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/05 2:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski as to Amy Wisner waiver sent on 6/29/2023, answer due 8/28/2023 (Spena, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
10 10 order Stipulation and Order Thu 06/29 3:58 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants Thomas Jeitschko and Judith Whipple to file responsive pleading and response to motion for preliminary injunction extended to 7/20/2023; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Thu 06/29 3:25 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to File First Responsive Pleading and Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by defendants Thomas Jeitschko, Judith Whipple (Watza, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Mon 06/05 4:20 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants Thomas Jeitschko and Judith Whipple to file responsive pleading and response to motion for preliminary injunction extended to 7/6/2023; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 06/05 3:34 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to File First Responsive Pleading and Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by defendants Thomas Jeitschko, Judith Whipple [Attorney Elizabeth M. Watza added to party Thomas Jeitschko(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth M. Watza added to party Judith Whipple(pty:dft)] (Watza, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/24 12:58 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Thomas Jeitschko served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; Judith Whipple served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023 (Langhofer, Tyson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 05/23 10:00 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Tyson Charles Langhofer on behalf of plaintiffs Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski (Langhofer, Tyson)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 05/19 9:03 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Thomas Jeitschko, Judith Whipple, Amy Wisner (mlc)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Fri 05/19 8:58 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (mlc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
3 3 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of a Motion Thu 05/18 8:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction2 filed by Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski (Spena, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 05/18 8:00 PM
MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiffs Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski; (Spena, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/18 7:45 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski (Spena, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - GoFundMe - A. Wisner,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Cancel the Patriarchy Pricing,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Rebellion Book pre-order,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Cancel the Patriarchy IG,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Rebellion Book,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - MKT 250 Syllabus,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - The Rebellion,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - A. Wisner IG post 2022.06.25,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - RV post,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - The Rebellion MKT-specific,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - The Rebellion - open space,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - TheRebellionOnline IG post, 2022.06.25,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - J. Van Hof email, 2023.03.01,
Att: 14 Summons to T. Jeitschko, J. Whipple, A. Wisner
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Thu 05/18 8:05 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiffs Nathan Barbieri, Nolan Radomski in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7062458 (Spena, Paul)
Related: [-]