Nebraska District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00108
Case Filed:May 16, 2023
Last checked: Friday May 19, 2023 3:10 AM CDT
Defendant
Robert Johnson (1)
Represented By
Stuart J. Dornan
Dornan, Troia Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matt E. Lierman
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info

GPO Apr 28 2023
ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTION ACT as to defendant Robert Johnson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)[8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
GPO May 02 2023
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Robert Johnson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)[8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
GPO Jun 14 2023
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline as to Robert Johnson. Pretrial Motion Deadline set for 7/13/2023. The time between June 13, 2023, and July 13, 2023, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP)
GPO Jul 17 2023
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nebraska is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Robert Johnson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP)
GPO Jul 18 2023
ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue 32 as to Robert Johnson. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and September 26, 2023, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. The Final Trial Order [Filing No. 27] is vacated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)
GPO Sep 12 2023
ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue 45 as to Robert Johnson. Jury Trial is continued to 11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and November 28, 2023, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)
GPO Sep 25 2023
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - CJA Counsel is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Tijuana L. Johnson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
GPO Oct 17 2023
ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Pretrial Motions, (Filing No. 76), is granted as to Tijuana L. Johnson. Pretrial motions shall be filed by November 17, 2023. In accordance with 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A), the Court finds that the ends of justice will be served by granting this motion and outweigh the interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Any additional time arising as a result of the granting of this motion, that is, the time between today's date and November 17, 2023, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Failure to grant this motion would deny counsel the reasonable time necessary for effective preparation, taking into account the exercise of due diligence, and the novelty and complexity of the case. The failure to grant this motion might result in a miscarriage of justice. 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) & (B). Failing to timely object to this order as provided under this court's local rules will be deemed a waiver of any right to later claim the time should not have been excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
GPO Nov 20 2023
ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Pretrial Motions, (Filing No. 79), is granted as to Tijuana L. Johnson. Pretrial motions shall be filed by December 18, 2023. In accordance with 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A), the Court finds that the ends of justice will be served by granting this motion and outweigh the interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Any additional time arising as a result of the granting of this motion, that is, the time between November 17, 2023, and December 18, 2023, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Failure to grant this motion would deny counsel the reasonable time necessary for effective preparation, taking into account the exercise of due diligence, and the novelty and complexity of the case. The failure to grant this motion might result in a miscarriage of justice. 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) & (B). Failing to timely object to this order as provided under this court's local rules will be deemed a waiver of any right to later claim the time should not have been excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
GPO Dec 04 2023
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - CJA Counsel is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Whitney R. Washington. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP)
GPO Jan 17 2024
ORDER granting 89 Motion to Continue Trial as to Whitney R. Washington. Jury Trial, for all defendants, is continued to 4/16/2024 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. A party may object to this order by filing an "Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order" no later than January 24, 2024. The objecting party must comply with all requirements of NECrimR 59.2. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MLF)ORDER granting 89 Motion to Continue Trial as to Whitney R. Washington. Jury Trial, for all defendants, is continued to 4/16/2024 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. A party may object to this order by filing an "Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order" no later than January 24, 2024. The objecting party must comply with all requirements of NECrimR 59.2. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MLF)ORDER granting 89 Motion to Continue Trial as to Whitney R. Washington. Jury Trial, for all defendants, is continued to 4/16/2024 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. A party may object to this order by filing an "Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order" no later than January 24, 2024. The objecting party must comply with all requirements of NECrimR 59.2. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MLF)
GPO Mar 29 2024
ORDER granting AMENDED MOTION to Continue Trial Date 93 as to Whitney R. Washington (3). Jury Trial , as to all defendants, is continued to 5/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and May 14, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. No further continuances will be granted without requesting a hearing before the undersigned magistrate judge. The Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial 92 is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)ORDER granting AMENDED MOTION to Continue Trial Date 93 as to Whitney R. Washington (3). Jury Trial , as to all defendants, is continued to 5/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and May 14, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. No further continuances will be granted without requesting a hearing before the undersigned magistrate judge. The Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial 92 is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)ORDER granting AMENDED MOTION to Continue Trial Date 93 as to Whitney R. Washington (3). Jury Trial , as to all defendants, is continued to 5/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and May 14, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. No further continuances will be granted without requesting a hearing before the undersigned magistrate judge. The Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial 92 is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)
GPO May 02 2024
ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial95, UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial96. Jury Trial as to all defendants, is continued to 6/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and June 25, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. No further continuances will be granted without requesting a hearing before the undersigned magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial95, UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial96. Jury Trial as to all defendants, is continued to 6/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and June 25, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. No further continuances will be granted without requesting a hearing before the undersigned magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial95, UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial96. Jury Trial as to all defendants, is continued to 6/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and June 25, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. No further continuances will be granted without requesting a hearing before the undersigned magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)
GPO Jun 05 2024
ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial 102 as to Whitney R. Washington (3). Jury Trial, as to all defendants, is continued to 8/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial 102 as to Whitney R. Washington (3). Jury Trial, as to all defendants, is continued to 8/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial 102 as to Whitney R. Washington (3). Jury Trial, as to all defendants, is continued to 8/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)
GPO Jun 05 2024
AMENDED ORDER - The jury trial, as to all defendants, now set for June 25, 2024, is continued to August 27, 2024. The time between today's date and August 27,2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under therequirement of the Speedy Trial Act. No further continuances will be granted without requesting a hearing before the undersigned magistrate judge as to defendants Tijuana L. Johnson, Whitney R. Washington, Robert Johnson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM) AMENDED ORDER - The jury trial, as to all defendants, now set for June 25, 2024, is continued to August 27, 2024. The time between today's date and August 27,2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under therequirement of the Speedy Trial Act. No further continuances will be granted without requesting a hearing before the undersigned magistrate judge as to defendants Tijuana L. Johnson, Whitney R. Washington, Robert Johnson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM) AMENDED ORDER - The jury trial, as to all defendants, now set for June 25, 2024, is continued to August 27, 2024. The time between today's date and August 27,2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under therequirement of the Speedy Trial Act. No further continuances will be granted without requesting a hearing before the undersigned magistrate judge as to defendants Tijuana L. Johnson, Whitney R. Washington, Robert Johnson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)
GPO Sep 30 2024
ORDER granting 132 Motion to Continue as to Whitney R. Washington (3). Jury Trial is continued to 11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and November 12, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Absent exceptional circumstances, no further continuances will be granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)
GPO Oct 31 2024
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Robert Johnson. The Government's Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture, Filing 144, is granted. Based upon the Forfeiture Allegation of the Indictment and the plea of guilty, the Government is hereby authorized to seize the $7,000.00 in United States currency. Defendant's interest in the $7,000.00 in United States currency is hereby forfeited to the Government for disposition in accordance with the law, subject to the provisions of 21 U.S.C. ' 853(n)(1). The $7,000.00 in United States currency is to be held by the Government in its secure custody and control. Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. ' 853(n)(1), the Government shall publish for at least thirty consecutive days on an official internet Government forfeiture site, www.forfeiture.gov., notice of this Preliminary Order of Forfeiture, notice of publication evidencing the Government's intent to dispose of the subject property in such manner as the Attorney General may direct, and notice that any person, other than the Defendant, having or claiming a legal interest in any of the subject property must file a Petition with the Court within thirty days of the final publication of notice or of receipt of actual notice, whichever is earlier. Upon adjudication of all third-party interests, this Court will enter a Final Order of Forfeiture pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 853(n), in which all interests will be addressed. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (E-mailed to USM) (LRM)
GPO Dec 16 2024
ORDER granting 173 Motion for Preliminary Forfeiture as to Whitney R. Washington. IT IS ORDERED: The Government's Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture, Filing 173, is granted. Based upon the Forfeiture Allegation of the Indictment and the plea of guilty, the Government is hereby authorized to seize the $7,000.00 in United States currency. Defendant 's interest in the $7,000.00 in United States currency is hereby forfeited to the Government for disposition in accordance with the law, subject to the provisions of 21 U.S.C. § 853(n)(1). The $7,000.00 in United States currency is to be held by the Government in its secure custody and control. Upon adjudication of all third-party interests, this Court will enter a Final Order of Forfeiture pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 853(n), in which all interests will be addressed. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. Certified copy to USM. (MLR)
GPO Jan 13 2025
ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 180 Motion for Final Forfeiture as to Robert Johnson (1) and Whitney R. Washington (3). All right, title and interest in and to the $7,000.00 seized from the Defendants on or about April 19, 2023, held by any person or entity are forever barred and foreclosed; The $7,000.00 is forfeited to the Government; and The Government is directed to dispose of that currency in accordance with the law. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (1 Certified copy to USM)(MKR)ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 180 Motion for Final Forfeiture as to Robert Johnson (1) and Whitney R. Washington (3). All right, title and interest in and to the $7,000.00 seized from the Defendants on or about April 19, 2023, held by any person or entity are forever barred and foreclosed; The $7,000.00 is forfeited to the Government; and The Government is directed to dispose of that currency in accordance with the law. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (1 Certified copy to USM)(MKR)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2023 4:01 AM CDT
Friday, April 21, 2023
Remark - Public: Case filed under seal on 4/21/23 and unsealed on 4/27/23 pursuant to memorandum as to defendant Robert Johnson. (LKO) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwartas to defendant Robert Johnson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (LKO) Modified on 4/27/2023 to restrict per filing no.4 (LKO). [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
2 2 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Robert Johnson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (LKO) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
4 4 NOTICE (MEMORANDUM) the Magistrate Judge Case but the underlying Complaint Affidavit should remain Restricted by Attorney Matt E. Lierman as to defendant Robert Johnson. (LKO) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
5 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING as to defendant Robert Johnson. Initial Appearance set for 4/28/2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan as to defendant(s) Robert Johnson. (Dornan, Stuart) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED as to defendant Robert Johnson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (LKO) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
9 9 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 4/28/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis as to defendant Robert Johnson. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint held. Oral order issued to counsel pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to issue. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 5/2/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Government's oral motion for detention is pending as to flight and danger. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal to be detained pending further order of the court. Hearing held in Omaha, NE. Appearance for Plaintiff: Matt E. Lierman, USA; Appearance for Defendant: Stuart J. Dornan, Retained; Appearance for Pretrial: Dylan J Rotert; Courtroom Deputy: Kristy Furey; Court Reporter: Digital Recorder. No interpreter used during hearing. Time Start: 1:31 PM; Time Stop: 1:36 PM; Time in Court: 5 Minutes. (KLF) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTION ACT as to defendant Robert Johnson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
11 11 AUDIO FILE. Audio as to Defendant (1) Robert Johnson. Court Date & Time [ 4/28/2023 1:31:23 PM ]. File Size [ 1302 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:26 ]. (Initial Appearance). (auto-docket). [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
12 12 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis as to defendant Robert Johnson. Preliminary Hearing held. Evidence by Plaintiff. The court takes judicial notice of the complaint, Filing No. 1. Probable cause is found. Defendant held to answer for further proceedings in the District of Nebraska. Detention hearing held. The court takes judicial notice of the Pretrial Services Report, Filing No. 7. Oral argument by Plaintiff and Defendant. Government's oral motion for detention is granted as to flight and danger. Order of detention to be issued. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal to be detained pending further order of the court. Hearing held in Omaha, NE. Appearance for Plaintiff: Matt E. Lierman, USA; Appearance for Defendant: Stuart J. Dornan, Retained; Appearance for Pretrial: Dylan Rotert; Courtroom Deputy: Amy Brunswick Court Reporter: Digital Recorder. No interpreter used during hearing. Time Start: 9:03 AM; Time Stop: 9:26 AM; Time in Court: 23 Minutes. (ADB) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs WITNESS LIST as to defendant Robert Johnson from hearing held on 5/2/23 regarding Detention and Preliminary hearing 12 . (ADB) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Robert Johnson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB) [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
15 15 AUDIO FILE. Audio as to Defendant (1) Robert Johnson. Court Date & Time [ 5/2/2023 9:03:48 AM ]. File Size [ 5344 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:22:16 ]. (Preliminary and detention hearing). (auto-docket). [8:23-mj-00238-SMB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
16 16 PART 1 OF 2 - INDICTMENT with foreperson's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act as to defendant Robert Johnson. (MKR)
Related: [-]
17 17 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE PAGE regarding Indictment16 as to defendant Robert Johnson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR)
Related: [-]
18 18 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Robert Johnson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR)
Related: [-]