Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:David J Novak
Case #: 3:23-mc-00005
Case Filed:May 19, 2023
Terminated:Sep 22, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 22, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/22 1:59 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER (Dismissing Motion for Partial Vacatur and Motion to Confirm Award) - This matter comes before the Court on SunTrust Investment Services, Inc.'s ("Plaintiff") Motion for Partial Vacatur of Arbitration Award ("Motion to Vacate" (ECF No. 1)), moving for the Court to vacate an award of punitive damages against SunTrust in the arbitration before the Financial Industrial Regulatory Authority ("FINRA"), and Michael Nathan Hudgins' ("Defendant") Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award ("Motion to Confirm" (ECF No. 2)), moving the Court to confirm the arbitration award against SunTrust. For the reasons stated below, the Court hereby DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate (ECF No. 1) and Defendant's Motion to Confirm (ECF No. 2). The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close the case. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 9/22/2023. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/10 3:35 PM
ORDER (Lifting Stay and Setting Deadlines) - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative and following this Court's June 8, 2023 Order staying all pending deadlines. As the parties failed to reach a resolution with Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on August 3, 2023, the Court hereby LIFTS the stay of all pending deadlines. Accordingly, the parties shall have fourteen (14) days from entry of this order to file any outstanding responses to pending motions, and six (6) days thereafter to reply. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 8/10/2023. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 08/08 9:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight:Settlement Conference held on 8/3/2023. (mful)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 06/29 1:14 PM
Settlement Conference set for 8/3/2023 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. (mful)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
8 8 4 pgs order Order Wed 06/28 3:11 PM
ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on August 3, 2023, at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 6/28/2023. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/08 4:08 PM
ORDER (Staying All Pending Deadlines) - This matter comes before the following an on-the-record status call on June 8, 2023. The Court hereby STAYS all deadlines in this case pending resolution of mediation with Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 6/8/2023. (smej, )
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/08 4:02 PM
ORDER Related [+] - This matter comes before the Court for pretrial case management and following an on-the-record status call on June 8, 2023. In the interest of judicial economy, the case is hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight for settlement purposes. The parties shall schedule a settlement conference no later than July 31, 2023, should the calendar of Magistrate Judge Speight allow. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 6/8/2023. (Copy sent to Judge Speight) (smej, )
Related: [-] ferring Case for Settlement Conference
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Thu 06/08 3:52 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for John E. MacDonald to appear Pro hac vice for SunTrust Investment Services, Inc. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 6/8/2023. (smej, )
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/08 1:26 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John E. MacDonald and Certification of Local Counsel Robert P. Floyd, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8973047. by SunTrust Investment Services, Inc.. (Floyd, Robert)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Thu 06/08 3:56 PM
Notice of Correction re4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John E. MacDonald - Mr. MacDonald is advised that his contact information must be updated through their PACER account. (smej, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/08 4:06 PM
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. (smej, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 06/08 4:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David J. Novak:On-The-Record Status Telephone Conference held on 6/8/2023. (Court Reporter Melissa Custis, OCR.)(cgar)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
3 3 16 pgs respoth Memorandum Fri 06/02 7:09 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Partially Vacate and in Support of Motion to Confirm to1 MOTION,2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Michael Nathan Hudgins.(Willett, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Fri 06/02 7:07 PM
MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award by Michael Nathan Hudgins. (Willett, Henry)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
1 1 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Fri 05/19 10:55 AM
Notice of and Motion for Partial Vacatur of Arbitration Award - Civil Miscellaneous Case SunTrust Investment Services, Inc. v. Michael Nathan Hudgins ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number BVAEDC-8943914.), filed by SunTrust Investment Services, Inc..(Floyd, Robert) Modified on 5/19/2023 (smej, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/19/2023) (smej, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/19/2023) (smej, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement Memo of Law in Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Memo of Law - Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit B to Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit C to Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit D to Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit E to Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit F to Declaration,
Att: 10 Exhibit G to Declaration,
Att: 11 Exhibit H to Declaration,
Att: 12 Exhibit I to Declaration,
Att: 13 Exhibit J to Declaration
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 05/19 12:45 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (smej, )
Related: [-]