Texas Western District Court
Judge:Fred Biery
Referred: Elizabeth S Chestney
Case #: 5:23-cv-00642
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 19, 2023
Terminated:Aug 11, 2023
Case in other court:County Court at Law No.1, Nueces County, Texas, 2022CCV-60432-1
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2023 5:07 AM CST
Defendant
ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES LAW FIRM PLLC
8118 DATAPOINT DRIVE
SAN ANTONIO, TX 78229
Represented By
Kandyce Palamarchuck
Law Offices Of Joe A. Gamez
contact info
Defendant
LAW OFFICES OF DIEGO LOPEZ, PLLC
LAW OFFICES OF DIEGO LOPEZ, PLLC DIEGO A. LOPEZ 8118 DATAPOINT DRIVE
SAN ANTONIO, TX 78229
Represented By
Diego A. Lopez
Law Offices Of Diego A. Lopez
contact info
Plaintiff
HILLIARD MARTINEZ GONZALES LLP
HILLIARD MARTINEZ GONZALES, LLP 719 S. SHORELINE BLVD
CORPUS CHRISTI, TX 78401
Represented By
Marion M. Reilly
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
T. Christopher Pinedo
Hillard Martinez Gonzales, LLP
contact info
Catherine Tobin
Hilliard Munoz Gonzales, LLP
contact info
John B. Martinez
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
Robert Paul Wilson
Thomas J. Henry Injury Attorneys
contact info
Rudy Gonzales, Jr.
Hilliard Munoz Gonzales, L.L.P.
contact info
Robert C. Hilliard
Hilliard Martinez Gonzales, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS J. HENRY
LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS J. HENRY ROBERT P. WILSON 521 STARR STREET
CORPUS CHRISTI, TX 78401
Represented By
Marion M. Reilly
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
T. Christopher Pinedo
Hillard Martinez Gonzales, LLP
contact info
Catherine Tobin
Hilliard Munoz Gonzales, LLP
contact info
John B. Martinez
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
Robert Paul Wilson
Thomas J. Henry Injury Attorneys
contact info
Rudy Gonzales, Jr.
Hilliard Munoz Gonzales, L.L.P.
contact info
Robert C. Hilliard
Hilliard Martinez Gonzales, LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 17 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 Motion to Remand to State Court,, filed by LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS J. HENRY. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, August 21, 2023
15 15 misc Clerk's Copy Tue 08/22 1:55 PM
Clerk's Copy of Remand Letter (mgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
13 13 misc Remark Mon 08/14 2:26 PM
Remand letter. (tm2)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (No Doc#) Mon 08/14 5:56 PM
Order14 , remand letter, and docket sheet were marked as certified copies and mailed to Nueces County District Courts office. (tm2)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Mon 08/14 2:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Motion to Remand to State Court Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (tm2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 07/18 4:25 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT--IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference set for August 2, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. is CANCELED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-entitled and numbered case is RETURNED to the District Court for all purposes.Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (tm2)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
11 11 misc Report and Recommendations Tue 07/18 9:44 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re9 Motion to Remand to State Court,, filed by LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS J. HENRY. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
10 10 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/06 9:54 AM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2023 2:00 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Remand to State Court Mon 06/05 10:27 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS J. HENRY.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Wilson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex.A-Order Approving Settlement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B-Pltfs Original Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex.C-Returns of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex.D-Dft Motion to Transfer Venue,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex.E-Order Denying Transfer of Venue (20230418),
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex.F-Conferral Email,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex.G-Affidavit of Attorney's Fees,
Att: 8 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Remand
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
8 8 motion Withdraw As Attorney Wed 05/31 11:27 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of John B. Martinez by HILLIARD MARTINEZ GONZALES LLP.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Martinez, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/31 10:01 AM
Text Order GRANTING4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDED AND DECREED that attorney Marion Reilly is hereby withdrawn as an attorney of record for this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/31 12:37 PM
Text Order GRANTING8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorney John B. Martinez is withdrawn as an attorney of record for this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/30 5:11 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/30 5:10 PM
COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
5 5 7 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial Tue 05/30 5:10 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days after any defendant has appeared., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
4 4 motion Withdraw As Attorney Fri 05/26 11:22 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Marion Reilly by HILLIARD MARTINEZ GONZALES LLP. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Marion
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting
3 3 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Fri 05/26 9:30 AM
Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorneys Kandyce Palamarchuck and Paul Anderson regarding Attorney Admission to the Western District of Texas. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
2 2 misc Supplement to Wed 05/24 11:23 AM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal, by LAW OFFICES OF DIEGO LOPEZ, PLLC. (Lopez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/19 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LAW OFFICES OF DIEGO LOPEZ, PLLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17460087), filed by LAW OFFICES OF DIEGO LOPEZ, PLLC.(Lopez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Certified Copy of State Court File,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Certificate of Notice
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/26 9:14 AM
Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Fri 05/26 9:15 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
Related: [-]