Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Philip P Simon
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 2:23-cv-00170
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:May 19, 2023
Terminated:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2023 5:50 AM EST
Defendant
Ammr Musleh
individually and in his professional capacity 7954 E. 108th Avenue
Winfield, IN 46307
Represented By
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Craig W Wiley
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Atta Musleh
individually and in his professional capacity 7954 E. 108th Avenue
Winfield, IN 46307
Represented By
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Craig W Wiley
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Moe Musleh
individually and in his professional capacity 7954 E. 108th Avenue
Winfield, IN 46307
Represented By
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Craig W Wiley
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Muayad Musleh
individually and in his professional capacity 7954 E. 108th Avenue
Winfield, IN 46307
Represented By
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Craig W Wiley
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Yasmin Musleh
individually and in her professional capacity 7954 E. 108th Avenue
Winfield, IN 46307
Represented By
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Craig W Wiley
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Musleh Fitness Inc
Represented By
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Craig W Wiley
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Anytime Fitness Franchisor LLC
Represented By
Gray Jeong
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Craig W Wiley
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Mediator
Tae Sture
Plaintiff
Diane Daniel
123 N. Main Street, 202
Crown Point, IN 46307
Represented By
James W Hortsman
James W Hortsman Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 17, 2024
56 56 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation to Dismiss Mon 06/17 1:11 PM
ORDER granting55 Stipulation to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, without costs to any party, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Defendants'42 Motion for Attorney Fees is DENIED AS MOOT. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 6/17/24. (jld)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
55 55 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Fri 06/14 4:11 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendants Moe Musleh, Anytime Fitness Franchisor LLC, Ammr Musleh, Atta Musleh, Musleh Fitness Inc, Muayad Musleh, Yasmin Musleh. (Wiley, Craig)
Related: [-]