Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Pedro A Delgado-Hernande
Case #: 3:23-cv-01258
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:May 19, 2023
Re-opened:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2023 6:57 AM AST
Defendant
SAI Systems Digital LLC
5 Research Drive
Shelton, CT 06484
Represented By
Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll
contact info
Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou
Amrc, LLC
contact info
William E Bradley
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
SAI Systems International, Inc.
5 Research Drive
Shelton, CT 06484
Represented By
Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll
contact info
Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou
Amrc, LLC
contact info
William E Bradley
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MedPharm Services LLC
3100 Carr. 199 Suite 202
San Juan, PR 00926
Represented By
Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font
Ferraiuoli LLC
contact info
Ali Hossein Khan Tehrani
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Brian Gearing
Crowell & Morring LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM AST
Friday, December 06, 2024
82 82 misc Transcript Request Fri 12/06 11:32 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by MedPharm Services LLC for proceedings held on November 15, 2024 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez.. Email Notification sent to Kelly Surina. (Vidal-Font, Jean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
81 81 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 12/05 6:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support / Plaintiff MedPharm Services LLCs Supplemental Sur-Reply in Support of its Motion for Sanctions against Defendants filed by MedPharm Services LLC Re:68 SURReply to Motion,, filed by MedPharm Services LLC filed by MedPharm Services LLC.(Gearing, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Ali H.K. Tehrani,
Att: 2 Exhibit Y,
Att: 3 Exhibit Z,
Att: 4 Exhibit AA,
Att: 5 Exhibit BB