Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:23-cv-21888
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 21, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2023
Last checked: Friday Nov 17, 2023 5:22 AM EST
Defendant
Ilan Khutorsky
an individual 336 East 18th Street #CE
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Robert Gerald Kemper, Jr.
contact info
David Matthew Levine
Sanchez Fischer Levine, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Raphael Khutorsky
an individual 336 East 18th Street #CE
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Robert Gerald Kemper, Jr.
contact info
David Matthew Levine
Sanchez Fischer Levine, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Something Good Supper Club, LLC
a Delaware Limited Liability Company c/o Interstate Agent Services, LLC 501 Silverside Road Suite 102
Wilmington, DE 19809
Represented By
Joshua Michael Salmon
Fuerst Ittleman David & Joseph
contact info
Gary M. Kushner
Goetz Fitzpatrick LLP
contact info
Allan Aaron Joseph
Fuerst Ittleman David & Joseph
contact info
Defendant
SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC
Represented By
Robert Gerald Kemper, Jr.
contact info
David Matthew Levine
Sanchez Fischer Levine, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MSB Hospitality, LLC
a Florida Limited Liability Company 1600 NE 1st Avenue Apt. 2818
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Joseph Isaiah Pardo
Joseph I. Pardo, Esq
contact info

GPO Jul 31 2023
ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (kin)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 31, 2023
37 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MSB Hospitality, LLC (Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
36 36 ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (kin)
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. PER DE#36 (cds)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
35 35 NOTICE of Settlement by MSB Hospitality, LLC (Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
34 34 NOTICE by Something Good Supper Club, LLC re33 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, and Memorandum of Law Notice of Filing Declaration of Ilan Khutorsky (Joseph, Allan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ilan Khutorsky
33 33 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, and Memorandum of Law by Something Good Supper Club, LLC. Responses due by 8/3/2023(Joseph, Allan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of Ilan Khutorsky
Friday, July 14, 2023
32 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Raphael Khutorsky, Other Affiliate Nelly Khutorsky for SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC (Levine, David)
Related: [-]
31 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting27 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before July 20, 2023 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/14/2023. (kin)
Related: [-]
30 30 NOTICE by Ilan Khutorsky, Raphael Khutorsky, SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC re29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for More Definite Statement in the Alternative ,28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for More Definite Statement in the Alternative re Notice of Conferral (Levine, David)
Related: [-]
Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Ilan Khutorsky response/answer due 7/20/2023; Raphael Khutorsky response/answer due 7/20/2023; SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC response/answer due 7/20/2023; Something Good Supper Club, LLC response/answer due 7/20/2023. PER DE#31 (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
29 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, , MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 7/27/2023), MOTION for More Definite Statement in the Alternative ( Responses due by 7/27/2023) by SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC.(Levine, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Raphael Khutorsky
28 28 22 pgs MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, , MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 7/27/2023), MOTION for More Definite Statement in the Alternative ( Responses due by 7/27/2023) by Ilan Khutorsky, Raphael Khutorsky. (Levine, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
27 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, within 7 days (07/20/2023) by Ilan Khutorsky, Raphael Khutorsky, SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC, Something Good Supper Club, LLC.(Levine, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
26 26 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gary Kushner, Esq. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Something Good Supper Club, LLC. Responses due by 7/26/2023(Salmon, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Gary Kushner, Esq,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
25 25 ORDER ON MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, denying21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Gary M. Kushner of Attorney Gary M. Kushner representing Something Good Supper Club, LLC (Defendant) Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Gary Kushner.. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Attorney Gary M. Kushner representing Something Good Supper Club, LLC (Defendant) Activated. (pt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
24 24 Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Something Good Supper Club, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Ilan Khutorsky Something Good Supper Club, LLC, Other Affiliate Raphael Khutorsky Something Good Supper Club, LLC, Other Affiliate Jackson Leonardo Something Good Supper Club, LLC for Something Good Supper Club, LLC (Joseph, Allan)
Related: [-]
23 23 Clerk's Notice to Filer re22 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. Martin Borkan Declaration of Trust U/A DTD, Martin S. Borkan, Jeckson Leonardo (cds)
Related: [-]
22 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Something Good Supper Club, LLC (Joseph, Allan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
21 21 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for GARY M. KUSHNER, ESQ. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16715855 by Something Good Supper Club, LLC. Responses due by 7/7/2023(Salmon, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Gary M. Kushner, Esq.,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
20 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Michael Salmon on behalf of Something Good Supper Club, LLC. Attorney Joshua Michael Salmon added to party Something Good Supper Club, LLC(pty:dft). (Salmon, Joshua)
Related: [-]
19 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 17 18 Defendants' Motions for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before July 13, 2023 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/14/2023. (kin)
Related: [-]
18 18 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint,14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint within 30 days (07/13/23) by Something Good Supper Club, LLC.(Joseph, Allan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Ilan Khutorsky response/answer due 7/13/2023; Raphael Khutorsky response/answer due 7/13/2023; SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC response/answer due 7/13/2023; Something Good Supper Club, LLC response/answer due 7/13/2023. PER DE#19 (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
17 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, within 30 days (07/13/2023) by Ilan Khutorsky, Raphael Khutorsky, SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC.(Levine, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
16 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Gerald Kemper, Jr on behalf of Ilan Khutorsky, Raphael Khutorsky, SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC. Attorney Robert Gerald Kemper, Jr added to party Ilan Khutorsky(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Gerald Kemper, Jr added to party Raphael Khutorsky(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Gerald Kemper, Jr added to party SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC(pty:dft). (Kemper, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Matthew Levine on behalf of Ilan Khutorsky, Raphael Khutorsky, SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC. Attorney David Matthew Levine added to party Ilan Khutorsky(pty:dft), Attorney David Matthew Levine added to party Raphael Khutorsky(pty:dft), Attorney David Matthew Levine added to party SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC(pty:dft). (Levine, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
14 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint within 30 days (07/13/23) by Something Good Supper Club, LLC. Attorney Allan Aaron Joseph added to party Something Good Supper Club, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/26/2023 (Joseph, Allan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
13 13 NOTICE by MSB Hospitality, LLC re9 Summons Returned Executed,10 Summons Returned Executed,11 Summons Returned Executed,12 Certificate of Service of Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by July 13, 2023 (Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MSB Hospitality, LLC re1 Complaint, on Raphael Khutorsky, individually (Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
11 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSB Hospitality, LLC. Ilan Khutorsky served on 5/23/2023, response/answer due 6/13/2023. (Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSB Hospitality, LLC. SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC served on 5/23/2023, response/answer due 6/13/2023. (Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
9 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSB Hospitality, LLC. Something Good Supper Club, LLC served on 5/23/2023, response/answer due 6/13/2023. (Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1, Fed. R. Civ. P. by MSB Hospitality, LLC (Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 7 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1720344)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
6 6 Summons Issued as to Ilan Khutorsky, Raphael Khutorsky, SANDO SUPPPLIES, LLC, Something Good Supper Club, LLC. (cds)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by MSB Hospitality, LLC (Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Summon(s) Something Good Supper Club LLC,
Att: 2 1 pgs Summon(s) Sando Supplies LLC,
Att: 3 1 pgs Summon(s) Ilan Khutorsky,
Att: 4 1 pgs Summon(s) Raphael Khutorsky
4 4 NOTICE by MSB Hospitality, LLC of filing Civil Cover Sheet (Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 21, 2023
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16634318, filed by MSB Hospitality, LLC.(Pardo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 27 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 7 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 5 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit 5