AERO HEC ACQUISITION I, LLC v. BRANSFORD et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | F Dennis Saylor, IV |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-11136 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Dukes County Superior Court, 2374cv00017 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:15 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Patricia Bransford
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Thomas Bransford
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Denis Richard McDonough
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patricia Bransford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas Bransford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 05/10 2:55 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting26 Motion to Continue NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 5/28/2024 03:20 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (McKillop, Matthew) |
|
28 | 28
order
Order consolidating cases
Fri 05/10 2:42 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER consolidating cases. All further proceedings in this case shall be filed under Case 1:23-cv-11136-FDS. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Fri 05/10 2:35 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING25 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Continue
Thu 05/09 4:51 PM
MOTION to Continue Status Conference to May 15-17, or after May 21, 2024 by Patricia Bransford, Thomas Bransford.(Jacobson, Jonas) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Consolidate Cases
Mon 05/06 8:43 AM
Assented to MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Lift Stay by Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC.(Long, Danielle) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 03/29 3:39 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Scheduling Conference held by telephone on 3/29/2024. Case called; Status discussed; Court STAYED the case due to counsel reporting preliminary stage of settlement. Further status conference set. NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 5/14/2024 03:00 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Danielle Long and Elizabeth Lonardo for the plaintiff. Jonas Jacobson and Brendan Mockler for the defendants.) (McKillop, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 02/27 3:57 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Scheduling Conference held by telephone on 2/27/2024. Case called; Status discussed; Scheduling Conference re-set. NOTICE OF HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2024 11:30 AM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Danielle Long and Elizabeth Lonardo for the plaintiff. Jonas Jacobson and Brendan Mockler for the defendants.) (McKillop, Matthew) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Scheduling Conference
Fri 02/02 12:22 PM
NOTICE of HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2024 03:20 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(McKillop, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Template Scheduling Order | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
13
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Thu 01/04 10:56 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, defendants' special motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 13 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Endorsement of Lis Pendens and Memorandum and Findings of Lis Pendens (Dkt. Nos. 5 , 7 ) are DENIED. So Ordered. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/06 2:34 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aero Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP, Corporate Parent ACOF HEF Cayman, Ltd., Corporate Parent ACOF III CIV-1 HEC Blocker, LLC for Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC.. (Long, Danielle) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/31 10:11 AM
United States' ANSWER to Complaint by Denis Richard McDonough.(Mockler, Brendan) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 07/13 2:09 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting17 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 28, 2023 to File Answer Denis Richard McDonough answer due 7/28/2023. (McKillop, Matthew) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/13 1:49 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 28, 2023 to File Answer by Denis Richard McDonough.(Mockler, Brendan) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Mon 07/10 2:00 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC.(Lonardo, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Opposition to Motion
Fri 06/30 10:35 AM
Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss (Special motion to dismiss, pursuant to G.L.c. 184 s. 15(c) (with certificate of service) filed by Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC. (Long, Danielle) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
12
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 06/19 4:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re13 MOTION to Dismiss (Special motion to dismiss, pursuant to G.L.c. 184 s. 15(c) (with certificate of service) ,5 MOTION for Lis Pendens filed by Patricia Bransford, Thomas Bransford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jacobson, Jonas) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Mon 06/19 4:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss (Special motion to dismiss, pursuant to G.L.c. 184 s. 15(c) (with certificate of service) by Patricia Bransford, Thomas Bransford.(Jacobson, Jonas) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 06/19 4:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM with certificate of service against Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC by Patricia Bransford, Thomas Bransford.(Jacobson, Jonas) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 06/14 11:44 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting10 MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/14/2023 to File Answer Denis Richard McDonough answer due 7/14/2023. (McKillop, Matthew) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/14 10:07 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/14/2023 to File Answer by Denis Richard McDonough.(Mockler, Brendan) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
Mon 06/05 9:44 AM
STATE COURT Record All Parties..(Mockler, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Action Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service of Process, | ||
Att: 4 Defendants' Letter to Court, | ||
Att: 5 Plaintiff's Opposition, | ||
Att: 6 Certified Record Request | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/25 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonas A. Jacobson on behalf of Patricia Bransford, Thomas Bransford (Jacobson, Jonas) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
motion
Order
Wed 05/24 1:57 PM
MOTION for Order to Memorandum and Findings of Lis Pendens by Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC.(Long, Danielle) |
|
6 | 6
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 05/24 1:49 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION for Lis Pendens filed by Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC. (Long, Danielle) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Lis Pendens
Wed 05/24 1:48 PM
MOTION for Lis Pendens by Aero HEC Acquisition I, LLC.(Long, Danielle) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Mon 05/22 3:28 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 05/22 3:15 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet
Mon 05/22 2:56 PM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re1 Notice of Removal, by Denis Richard McDonough. (Mockler, Brendan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 05/22 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Denis Richard McDonough ( Fee Status: US Government)(Mockler, Brendan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/22/2023 with corrected PDF, per counsel's request.) (de Oliveira, Flaviana). (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 (5/22/2023) State Court Docs |