Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:23-cv-00663
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action
Case Filed:May 22, 2023
Terminated:Jul 27, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:29 AM EST
Defendant
Director Antonio Donis
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Plaintiff
Slas Arefayne Woldehiwot
Represented By
John William Goodman
Murray Osorio PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 27, 2023
5 5 order So Ordered Thu 07/27 1:03 PM
So Ordered in re4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Slas Arefayne Woldehiwot. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/26/2023. (Sbro)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/24 8:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Slas Arefayne Woldehiwot (Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 05/23 10:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Antonio Donis, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Monday, May 22, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 05/22 12:18 PM
Proposed Summons by Slas Arefayne Woldehiwot. (Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/22 12:05 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8946253.), filed by Slas Arefayne Woldehiwot.(Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit I-589 Receipt Notice,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 05/23 9:54 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Sbro)
Related: [-]