Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:David J Novak
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-00666
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause26:7434 IRS Fraudulent Loans
Case Filed:May 22, 2023
Terminated:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:29 AM EST
Defendant
FRC Balance LLC
Represented By
Douglas Calvin Lynn, III
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Ashlee Williams
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandee Haley
Represented By
Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Zipin, Amster, & Greenberg LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Julia Velasquez
Represented By
Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Zipin, Amster, & Greenberg LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
67 67 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 01/27 2:54 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER (Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees): The Court ORDERS Defendant to pay Plaintiff attorneys' fees in the amount of $75,832.79 and reimburse litigation costs of $3,000. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 01/27/2025. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
Related: [-]