Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert E Payne
Case #: 3:23-cv-00339
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18 USC 1595 Human Trafficking Litigation
Case Filed:May 22, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:29 AM EST
Defendant
Harmanpreet Singh
Defendant
Armaan VA Corp.
Defendant
Kulbir Kaur
Plaintiff
Bhupinder Singh
Represented By
Craig Juraj Curwood
Butler Curwood PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
51 51 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 1:11 PM
ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED until Thursday, June 5, 2025, at 10am. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 4/23/2025. (sbea)
Related: [-]
minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 04/23 12:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/23/2025. Appearances: Craig Curwood, Jacqueline Crtizer, Charles Samuels (phone). (nbrow)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/23 1:21 PM
Set Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference (cont'd) set for 6/5/2025 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (nbrow)
Related: [-]