Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandon S Long
Referred: Eva J Dossier
Case #: 2:23-cv-01723
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1391 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 22, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 4:09 AM CST
Defendant
J. Terrell Brown, Sr.
Represented By
John Thomas Andrishok
Taylor Porter Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Robert W. Barton
Taylor Porter
contact info
Bethany Breaux Percle
Taylor, Porter, Brooks, Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert D Field, Jr
Represented By
Matthew W. McDade
Balch & Bingham, Llp (gulfport)
contact info
Defendant
TL Hawk, LLC
Defendant
TL Hawk Industrial, LLC
Defendant
Sewer Hawk, LLC
Represented By
R. Gray Sexton
R. Gray Sexton
contact info
Blane Andrew Wilson
Law Office Of R. Gray Sexton
contact info
Defendant
John T. Brown Development, LLC
Represented By
John Thomas Andrishok
Taylor Porter Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Robert W. Barton
Taylor Porter
contact info
Bethany Breaux Percle
Taylor, Porter, Brooks, Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Horseshoe Investments, LLC
Represented By
John Thomas Andrishok
Taylor Porter Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Robert W. Barton
Taylor Porter
contact info
Bethany Breaux Percle
Taylor, Porter, Brooks, Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hawk RKJ, LLC
Defendant
Hawk RDF, LLC
Represented By
Matthew W. McDade
Balch & Bingham, Llp (gulfport)
contact info
Defendant
Hawk Industries Holding Company, LLC
Defendant
Lauren D. Field
Represented By
Matthew W. McDade
Balch & Bingham, Llp (gulfport)
contact info
Defendant
Brad Dutruch
Represented By
R. Gray Sexton
R. Gray Sexton
contact info
Blane Andrew Wilson
Law Office Of R. Gray Sexton
contact info
Defendant
J. Terrell Brown, Jr.
Represented By
John Thomas Andrishok
Taylor Porter Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Robert W. Barton
Taylor Porter
contact info
Bethany Breaux Percle
Taylor, Porter, Brooks, Phillips, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Elliot W. Scharfenberg
Krebs Farley, PLLC
contact info
Joshua K. Chesser
Krebs Farley, PLLC
contact info
AsheLee Singleton
Krebs Farley, PLLC
contact info
Jessica R. Derenbecker
Krebs Farley & Dry, PLLC
contact info
Hannah N. Lafrance
Krebs Farley & Dry
contact info
Christopher H. Corkern
Deutsch Kerrigan, L.L.P.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Rodney K. James
Terminated: 08/30/2023
Represented By
Christopher K. LeMieux
Riess Lemieux, LLC
contact info
Robyn Brown
Riess Lemieux
contact info
Corey Lloyd
Riess Lemieux
contact info

GPO Aug 09 2023
ORDER AND REASONS denying 13 Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens and lack of subject matter jurisdiction or, alternatively, a motion to strike certain allegations and 16 Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens. FURTHER ORDERED that any responses to C&F's motion for a preliminary injunction must be filed no later than 08/23/2023. Any replies must be filed no later than 08/30/2023. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 08/09/2023. (ko)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
241 241 motion Stay Mon 05/12 9:33 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Stay Action by United States Fire Insurance Company.(Scharfenberg, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order