Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Case #: 1:23-cv-02273
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:May 19, 2023
Terminated:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2023 5:53 AM EST
Defendant
ABC Corporation
Defendant
Freedom Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant
Innovation Truck Service, LLC
Represented By
Aaron Miller
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Marc Howard Bardack
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
John Doe #1-3
Plaintiff
Shenae Dawkins
Represented By
N. John Bey
Bey And Associates, LLC
contact info
James Griffin O'Brien
Bey & Associates, LLC
contact info
Marta Batiste
Bey And Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
36 36 appeal USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal Tue 04/29 4:06 PM
USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-2(c),31 Notice of Appeal, is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Shenae Dawkins failed to file an appendix within the time fixed by the rules. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit, Case Number 24-13956 JJ. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
35 35 appeal FRAP 11 Certification Request Mon 04/07 1:41 PM
Forthwith Request by Circuit to district court for entry of Fed.R.App.P. 11 Certification re31 Notice of Appeal, filed by Shenae Dawkins. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit, Case Number 24-13956 JJ. (bgt)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Certified Mon 04/07 1:43 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,31 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit, Case Number 24-13956 JJ. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
34 34 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Thu 12/05 11:13 AM
USCA Acknowledgment of31 Notice of Appeal, filed by Shenae Dawkins. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 24-13956 J. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
33 33 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 12/02 11:23 AM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to USCA- 11th Circuit re:31 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
Related: [-]
32 32 appeal USCA Appeal Transmission Mon 12/02 11:18 AM
USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to USCA- 11th Circuit re:31 Notice of Appeal, filed by Shenae Dawkins. (pjm)
Related: [-]
31 31 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 12/02 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to29 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,30 Clerk's Judgment, by Shenae Dawkins. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AGANDC-13898180. Transcript Order Form due on 12/16/2024 (O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
30 30 misc Judgment - Clerk Thu 10/31 4:49 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff. Plaintiff's claims against fictitious parties, John Does# 1-3 and ABC Corp. are DISMISSED. It is further ordered that the plaintiff take nothing; that the defendants Innovation Truck Service, LLC and Freedom Specialty Insurance Company recover their costs of this action, and the action be, and the same hereby, is dismissed. (rsg)
Related: [-]
29 29 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 10/31 4:41 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Also, Plaintiff's claims against fictitious parties, John Does# 1-3 and ABC Corp. are DISMISSED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this civil action. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/31/24. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 10/31 4:42 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 08/28 3:12 PM
Submission of24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
28 28 respm Reply Brief Thu 08/15 3:03 PM
REPLY BRIEF re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Innovation Truck Service, LLC.(Bardack, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 02.18.24 email requesting deposition,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 03.04.24 follow-up email for deposition dates,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 03.22.24 email regarding unilateral notice,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 03.25.24 email response with deposition dates,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 03.26.24 email regarding discovery extension, requests & 30 (b)(6),
Att: 6 Exhibit F - 03.26.24 response email,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - 04.23.24 email regarding extension of discovery,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery Materials,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - 06.24.24 email regarding considering asking for leave for 30 (b)(6)
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
27 27 respm Response to Statement of Material Facts Wed 08/14 12:05 AM
Response to Statement of Material Facts re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shenae Dawkins. (O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
26 26 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/13 11:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of James G. O'Brien) filed by Shenae Dawkins.(O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - RFA Responses,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - RFP Responses,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - FMCSA Listing,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Agent Listing,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Agent Listing
25 25 respm Response to Motion Tue 08/13 11:38 PM
RESPONSE re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shenae Dawkins. (O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
24 24 motion Summary Judgment Tue 07/23 4:38 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Innovation Truck Service, LLC.(Bardack, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Deposition of Shenae Dawkins,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Complaint for Damages,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Pennsylvania Registration,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Certificate of Organization Mize Hill Trucking, LLC,
Att: 7 Statement of Material Facts
Friday, June 21, 2024
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Fri 06/21 3:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Pursuant to Local Rule 5.4 by Innovation Truck Service, LLC.(Miller, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 05/29 3:17 PM
ORDER denying20 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. However, the Court will reopen discovery through June 23, 2024. Because this will result in a total discovery period of eight months, twice the time generally afforded in this type of civil action, further requests for additional time for discovery will not be considered favorably. Dispositive motions shall be filed by July 23, 2024. In the event no dispositive motions are filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order shall be filed by July 23, 2024. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/29/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Wed 05/22 2:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests on Defendant Innovation Truck Service LLC by Shenae Dawkins.(O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 05/22 2:28 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (60-Day Extension) by Shenae Dawkins.(O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/01 3:35 PM
ORDER advising the parties that Defendant's response6 to the Court's Order3 establishes that diversity jurisdiction exists. Thus, no further action is required. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 05/01/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/08 2:24 PM
NOTICE by Innovation Truck Service, LLC of Intent to Serve Subpoena for Production of Documents (Bardack, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
17 17 notice Notice to Take Deposition Fri 03/29 7:53 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Shenae Dawkins filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Innovation Truck Service, LLC (Miller, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/23 4:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER approving the12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 4/23/2024. Motions due by 5/23/2024. If a motion for summaryjudgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Court's ruling thereon. If neither motion(s) for summary judgment nor the proposed pretrial order are timely filed, the Clerk is directed to submit this matter for the Court for consideration. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/23/2023. (rsg)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Initial Disclosures Mon 10/23 1:51 PM
Initial Disclosures by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Innovation Truck Service, LLC.(Bardack, Marc)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/23 1:49 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Innovation Truck Service, LLC. (Bardack, Marc)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/23 11:45 AM
First Certificate of Interested Persons by Shenae Dawkins. (O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
12 12 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 10/20 11:38 AM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Innovation Truck Service, LLC. (Bardack, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/17 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Griffin O'Brien on behalf of Shenae Dawkins (O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order Mon 10/16 4:57 PM
ORDER directing the parties to file Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements (individually), and the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan (jointly) within seven (7) calendar days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/16/2023. (pdw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/09 11:49 PM
NOTICE by Innovation Truck Service, LLC of Intent to Serve Subpoenas for Production of Documents (Bardack, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
8 8 discov Certificate of Service Wed 09/27 9:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's discovery by Shenae Dawkins.(O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
7 7 discov Certificate of Service Mon 08/28 1:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Pursuant to Local Rule 5.4 by Innovation Truck Service, LLC.(Miller, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 06/08 2:44 PM
Submission of6 Response to Order to Show Cause,3 Order to Show Cause,, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
6 6 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 06/06 3:55 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:3 Order to Show Cause, filed by Innovation Truck Service, LLC.(Bardack, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Genesis Vega,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Freedom Incorporation Documents
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Tue 06/06 10:13 AM
COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
4 4 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 05/23 12:25 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Marta Batiste. Clerk to follow-up by 6/2/2023. (djs)
Related: [-]
3 3 8 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/23 10:09 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS Innovation to Amend its Notice of Removal and properly allege the citizenship of all served Parties in the Action WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 05/22/2023. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 05/22 9:07 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Innovation Truck Service, LLC. Discovery ends on 10/16/2023. (Originally filed in the Superior Court of Fulton County on 5/19/2023)(ane)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 05/22 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Innovation Truck Service, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12610732)(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Demand,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet