Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:23-cv-00659
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:May 19, 2023
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2023 6:04 AM EST
Cross Claimant
Topbuild Home Services, Inc.
Represented By
Christine Kennedy
Baker & Hostetler Llp(dc-Na)
contact info
John Fornaciari
Baker & Hostetler Llp(dc-Na)
contact info
Katherine Lea McKnight
Baker & Hostetler Llp (dc)
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Scully
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
Sekas Homes, LTD.
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Cross Claimant
John P. Sekas
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Cross Claimant
Connor Sekas
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Cross Claimant
Collin Sekas
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Cross Claimant
Reston Valley, L.C.
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Cross Claimant
Bryan Deege
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Cross Defendant
Topbuild Home Services, Inc.
Represented By
Christine Kennedy
Baker & Hostetler Llp(dc-Na)
contact info
John Fornaciari
Baker & Hostetler Llp(dc-Na)
contact info
Katherine Lea McKnight
Baker & Hostetler Llp (dc)
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Scully
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Sekas Homes, LTD.
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Defendant
Sekas Homes, LTD.
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Defendant
Topbuild Home Services, Inc.
Represented By
Christine Kennedy
Baker & Hostetler Llp(dc-Na)
contact info
John Fornaciari
Baker & Hostetler Llp(dc-Na)
contact info
Katherine Lea McKnight
Baker & Hostetler Llp (dc)
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Scully
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC
Represented By
Dannel Charles Duddy
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Defendant
John P. Sekas
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Defendant
Connor Sekas
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Defendant
Collin Sekas
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Defendant
Reston Valley, L.C.
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Defendant
Austin W. Luther, IV
Represented By
Dannel Charles Duddy
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Defendant
Frederick Lowry
Represented By
Christine Kirchner
Moore, Christoff & Siddiqui, PLLC
contact info
Samuel Collyns Moore
Moore, Christoff & Siddiqui, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Bryan Deege
Represented By
William Wirt Brock
Carmichael Ellis & Brock
contact info
Defendant
Air Control, LLC
Represented By
Christine Kirchner
Moore, Christoff & Siddiqui, PLLC
contact info
Samuel Collyns Moore
Moore, Christoff & Siddiqui, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert A. Caplen
11696 Sunrise Square Place
Reston, VA 20191


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 05, 2024
113 113 order So Ordered Mon 02/05 3:04 PM
So Ordered in re112 STIPULATION of Dismissal Jointly Submitted with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/5/2024. (Dest)
Related: [-]
112 112 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/05 11:26 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Jointly Submitted by Bryan Deege, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD., Topbuild Home Services, Inc.. (McKnight, Katherine)
Related: [-]