Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert E Payne
Case #: 3:23-cv-00340
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 22, 2023
Terminated:Sep 18, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:30 AM EST
Defendant
Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By
Alfred Dumetz Carry
Mcglinchey Stafford Pllc (dc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M Palumbo
Represented By
Henry W. McLaughlin, III
The Law Office Of Henry Mclaughlin, P. C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 15, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/15 7:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Corrected to complete citation of Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i)) by Thomas M Palumbo (McLaughlin, Henry)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Seal Fri 09/15 3:15 PM
ORDER that the following motions are denied as moot: (1) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECFNo.12 ); and (2) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (ECF No.15 ). It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 9/15/2023. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/13 10:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Thomas M Palumbo (McLaughlin, Henry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) Wed 08/30 11:34 AM
Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC re15 MOTION to Seal Record Document 13 and its Attachments (Carry, Alfred)
Related: [-]
16 16 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 08/30 11:29 AM
Memorandum in Support re15 MOTION to Seal Record Document 13 and its Attachments filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Carry, Alfred)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Seal Wed 08/30 11:24 AM
MOTION to Seal Record Document 13 and its Attachments by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.(Carry, Alfred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 23 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 08/30 11:14 AM
Memorandum in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Public Redacted Version] filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.(Carry, Alfred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Index,
Att: 2 Ex. A,
Att: 3 Ex. B,
Att: 4 Ex. C,
Att: 5 Ex. D,
Att: 6 Ex. E
13 13 misc Sealed Memorandum in Support Wed 08/30 11:01 AM
Sealed Memorandum in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim .(Carry, Alfred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Index,
Att: 2 Ex. A,
Att: 3 Ex. B,
Att: 4 Ex. C,
Att: 5 Ex. D,
Att: 6 Ex. E
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/30 10:56 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.(Carry, Alfred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 08/30 10:46 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Carry, Alfred)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/30 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred Dumetz Carry on behalf of Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Carry, Alfred)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/17 11:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas M Palumbo Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023 (McLaughlin, Henry)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Thu 08/17 9:29 AM
Notice of Correction re8 : Filing attorney notified to re-file using the proper event for executed summons. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 08/16 8:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons on Carrington Morgage Services, LLC served on Lauren Phillips on 8/11/2023, filed by Thomas M Palumbo. (McLaughlin, Henry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 07/05 3:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint and Amended Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 04, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 07/04 9:25 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Thomas M Palumbo as to Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (McLaughlin, Henry)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Fri 06/30 9:15 PM
Proposed Summons re4 Amended Complaint to Carrington Morgage Services, LLC by Thomas M Palumbo. (McLaughlin, Henry)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/12 1:30 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thomas M Palumbo, filed by Thomas M Palumbo.(McLaughlin, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Loan Modification Statement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Statement
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 05/30 10:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Electronically file the return using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Tue 05/30 10:50 AM
Notice of Correction re2 : Filing attorney reminded only one summons per defendant needs to be filed. Clerk has corrected and no further action is needed. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 29, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 05/29 9:30 PM
Proposed Summons to Carrington Morgage Services, LLCX by Thomas M Palumbo. (McLaughlin, Henry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
misc Notice of Correction Tue 05/23 10:36 AM
Notice of Correction: Filing attorney reminded to electronically file the proposed summonses or waiver of service. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/22 8:17 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8947293.), filed by Thomas M Palumbo.(McLaughlin, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Bank Statements,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 05/23 10:31 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]