Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Donald E Walter
Referred: Mark L Hornsby
Case #: 5:23-cv-00683
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause12:0191 Bank Foreclosure
Case Filed:May 22, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 4:00 AM CST
Defendant
A T Belleville Crossing IL-Inline L L C
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
A T Bloomington IL L L C
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
1200 West Retta Esplanad, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
A T Briargate IL L L C
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
A T Forum Louisville KY II L L C
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
A T Wheatland Naperville IL L L C
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
Arciterra Strategic Income Corp - Belleville Crossing IL
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
Arciterra Strategic Retail Advisor L L C
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
Arciterra Strategic Retail-Briargate & Linden IL L L C
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
Arciterra Strategic Retail-Wheatland IL L L C
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
Arciterra U S B Rochester MN L L C
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan M Larmore
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Defendant
Spike Holdings L L C
1200 West Retta Esplanade 57A
Punta Gorda, FL 33950
Represented By
McLaurine Hall Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
W Michael Adams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
McLaurine H Zentner
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Stacey D Williams
Blanchard Walker Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
First Guaranty Bank
Represented By
Bradley L Drell
Gold Weems Et Al
contact info
Heather M Mathews
Gold Weems Et Al
contact info
Receiver
Trigild Inc


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
162 162 misc Status Report Thu 05/01 3:51 PM
1st Quarter 2025 Receiver Report STATUS REPORT by First Guaranty Bank.(aty,Drell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 FGB Arciterra RecRep2025Q1Redacted Part 2
Monday, April 28, 2025
161 161 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/29 9:19 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Jonathan M Larmore, 11751 E. Black Point Rd Syracuse, IN 46567, re:154 Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian returned marked: Return to Sender; Attempted - Not Known; Unable to forward. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]