Blanton v. Young
Original Case: 1:22-cv-01728
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01171 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 30, 2023 2:23 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JASON YOUNG
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
GINA BLANTON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 2:23 AM MDT |
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
[11000568] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/19/2023 Fee or ifp forms due 06/20/2023 for Gina Blanton. Notice of appearance due on 06/20/2023 for Gina Blanton 23-1171 | ||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |