Connecticut District Court
Judge:Stefan R Underhill
Referred: Thomas O Farrish
Case #: 3:23-cv-00669
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 23, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 4:57 AM EST
Defendant
Town of Bethlehem
Represented By
Mark A. Milano
Milano & Wanat LLC
contact info
Michael A. Zizka
Halloran & Sage, LLP
contact info
Kenneth R. Slater, Jr.
Halloran & Sage
contact info
Plaintiff
Grillo Services, LLC
Represented By
Alexander J. Trembicki
Lynch, Trembicki, Martelon & Boynton
contact info
Plaintiff
Mike and Jude, LLC
Represented By
Alexander J. Trembicki
Lynch, Trembicki, Martelon & Boynton
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
40 40 order Order on Motion to Withdraw Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 04/21 3:03 PM
ORDER granting39 Motion to Withdraw; denying as moot35 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/21/2025. (Markowitz, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
39 39 motion Withdraw Fri 04/18 1:29 PM
MOTION to Withdraw35 MOTION for Protective Order by Town of Bethlehem. (Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/14 5:00 PM
REPLY to Response to35 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Town of Bethlehem.(Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
37 37 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 04/01 11:09 AM
Second Memorandum in Support re35 MOTION for Protective Order Corrected filed by Grillo Services, LLC, Mike and Jude, LLC. (Trembicki, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
36 36 respm Objection Fri 03/28 2:43 PM
First OBJECTION to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order filed by Grillo Services, LLC, Mike and Jude, LLC.(Trembicki, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in support of Objection
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
35 35 motion Protective Order Wed 01/29 12:38 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Town of Bethlehem.Responses due by 2/19/2025(Mayano, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Friday, July 19, 2024
34 34 order Scheduling Order Fri 07/19 4:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to communications with counsel, the following deadlines are set: Fact Discovery due by 11/15/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2025. Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/19/2024.(Markowitz, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
33 33 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Fri 05/10 1:34 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Town of Bethlehem. (Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
32 32 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 05/09 3:31 PM
ORDER granting31 Defendant's Motion to Amend/Correct Answer to Add Fourth Affirmative Defense. Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/9/2024. (Markowitz, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
31 31 motion Amend/Correct Tue 05/07 4:45 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Add Fourth Affirmative Defense by Town of Bethlehem.Responses due by 5/28/2024 (Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/05 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Christopher Mayano on behalf of Town of Bethlehem (Mayano, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 11/07 5:53 PM
ORDER granting28 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/12/2023 TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/7/2023. (Markowitz, C.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
28 28 motion Extension of Time Fri 11/03 9:12 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/12/2023 TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY by Town of Bethlehem. (Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 11/01 4:50 PM
ORDER granting26 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until December 6 2023 to respond to Interrogatories and Request for Production. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/1/2023. (Markowitz, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
26 26 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/31 4:03 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time until December 6 2023 Interrogatories and Request for Production by Grillo Services, LLC, Mike and Jude, LLC. (Trembicki, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/10 10:54 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time until November 6, 2023 to respond to Defendant's Interrogatories and Request for Production. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/10/2023. (Markowitz, C.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/10 10:57 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time until November 12, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/10/2023. (Markowitz, C.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
23 23 motion Extension of Time Thu 10/05 11:05 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/12/2023 Respond to Discovery by Town of Bethlehem. (Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
22 22 motion Extension of Time Wed 10/04 11:44 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time until November 6, 2023 Interrogatories and Request for Production by Grillo Services, LLC, Mike and Jude, LLC. (Trembicki, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
20 20 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 07/07 4:08 PM
Amended ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Town of Bethlehem.(Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 07/11 3:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/7/2023. Total Time: 00 hours and 23 minutes (Guerrier, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/27 2:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Town of Bethlehem, filed by Grillo Services, LLC, Mike and Jude, LLC.(Trembicki, Alexander)
Related: [-]
utility Calendar Entry Tue 06/27 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 7/7/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is 888.636.3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650.8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Guerrier, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 06/20 3:54 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trembicki, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 06/07 3:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Town of Bethlehem.(Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 06/06 9:49 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Grillo Services, LLC, Mike and Jude, LLC. (Trembicki, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
14 14 misc Jury Demand Fri 05/26 12:24 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Grillo Services, LLC, Mike and Jude, LLC. (Trembicki, Alexander)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/26 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Zizka on behalf of Town of Bethlehem (Zizka, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/25 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. Slater, Jr on behalf of Town of Bethlehem (Slater, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/25 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Trembicki on behalf of Grillo Services, LLC, Mike and Jude, LLC (Trembicki, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 05/24 11:09 AM
Disclosure Statement Corporate by Town of Bethlehem. (Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/24 10:53 AM
NOTICE by Town of Bethlehem Notice of Pending Motions (Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/24 10:51 AM
NOTICE by Town of Bethlehem Defendant's Statement Regarding Removal (Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Tue 05/23 12:22 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of6 Protective Order,4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,5 Electronic Filing Order,2 Notice of Appearance filed by Town of Bethlehem, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal filed by Town of Bethlehem Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2023. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Removal Standing Order
6 6 order Protective Order Tue 05/23 12:21 PM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/23/2023. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 05/23 12:20 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/23/2023. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 05/23 12:19 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2023 Discovery due by 11/22/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 12/27/2023 Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2023. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/23 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Milano on behalf of Town of Bethlehem (Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 05/23 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Town of Bethlehem from Milford Superior Court, case number AAN-CV23-6051142 S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7356732, filed by Town of Bethlehem.(Milano, Mark)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Tue 05/23 11:19 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2023.(Perez, J.)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 05/23 12:16 PM
Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]