Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Monte C Richardson
Case #: 3:23-cv-00619
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 23, 2023
Terminated:May 28, 2024
Case in other court:Nassau County Circuit Court, 2023-CA-000103
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:10 AM EST
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By
Deana Nicole Dunham
Luks, Santaniello, Petrillo & Jones, LLC
contact info
Todd T. Springer
Luks, Santaniello, Petrillo & Jones, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Martha Williams
Represented By
Deana Nicole Dunham
Luks, Santaniello, Petrillo & Jones, LLC
contact info
Mediator
Pamela Klavon
Represented By
Pamela Haddock Klavon
The Liles Firm, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Rogero
Represented By
Elie Anidjar
Law Office Of Anidjar & Levine, P.A.
contact info
Arlen Mason Weintraub
Law Offices Of Anidjar & Levine, P.A.
contact info
Glen B. Levine
contact info
Lawrence Allen Levine
Anidjar & Levine
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
59 59 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 05/29 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
58 58 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/28 3:47 PM
ORDER remanding this case to the Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Nassau County, Florida, Case Number 2023-CA-000103. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/28/2024. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
57 57 motion Appear Telephonically / Video Fri 05/24 8:16 AM
MOTION for Deana N. Dunham to appear telephonically by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Dunham, Deana)
Related: [-]