Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Sharion Aycock
Referred: Roy Percy
Case #: 1:23-cv-00081
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 23, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 4:23 AM CST
Defendant
IUE-CWA Local 83770
Represented By
Robert F. Holt
International Union Of Electronic Worker
contact info
William H. Hussey
Maxey Wann PLLC
contact info
Charles Henry Best, III
Maxey Wann
contact info
Defendant
M1 Support Services, LP
Represented By
Yvonne N. Maddalena
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Tammy L. Baker
Jackson Lewis Llp - Birmingham
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Renea Pegg
Represented By
Jim D. Waide, III
Waide & Associates, PA
contact info
Rachel Pierce Waide
Waide & Associates, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
158 158 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/05 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Ellis Black on behalf of M1 Support Services, LP (Black, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
157 157 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/04 2:01 PM
ORDER granting154 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Samuel Ellis Black. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/4/25. (rrh)
Related: [-]
156 156 notice Notice of Conference Tue 02/04 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2025 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
Related: [-]
155 155 misc Exhibits to Other Document Tue 02/04 11:30 AM
EXHIBIT re154 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Samuel Ellis Black,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2488863) . (Maddalena, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
154 154 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/04 11:29 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Samuel Ellis Black,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2488863) by M1 Support Services, LP. (Maddalena, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
153 153 notice Notice of Trial Thu 01/30 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial RESET for 11/3/2025 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (Est. 4-5 days) (tjw)
Related: [-]