Maine District Court
Judge:Lance E Walker
Referred: John C Nivison
Case #: 1:23-cv-00214
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 23, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:22 AM EST
Defendant
HERMON SCHOOL DEPARTMENT
Represented By
MELISSA A. HEWEY
Drummond Woodsum & Macmahon
contact info
Plaintiff
MATT GIOIA
Represented By
WENONAH MARIA WIRICK
Conley & Wirick, P.A.
contact info
MARIAH GONDEIRO
Advocates For Faith And Freedom
contact info
JULIANNE E. FLEISCHER
Advocates For Faith And Freedom
contact info
WENONAH WIRICK
Conley & Wirick, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
PINES CHURCH
Represented By
WENONAH MARIA WIRICK
Conley & Wirick, P.A.
contact info
MARIAH GONDEIRO
Advocates For Faith And Freedom
contact info
JULIANNE E. FLEISCHER
Advocates For Faith And Freedom
contact info
WENONAH WIRICK
Conley & Wirick, P.A.
contact info

GPO Feb 23 2024
ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LATE RESPONSE STATEMENT TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS granting 35 Ex Parte Motion (cc: cnsl) By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
GPO Jul 31 2024
ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (cjd)
GPO Jan 23 2025
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Continue Trial, Motion to Reopen Discovery, Motion for Sanctions By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (clp)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
103 103 notice Notice (Other)/Correspondence Wed 05/07 11:48 AM
NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Memorandum in Response to Plaintiffs Statement of Authority by HERMON SCHOOL DEPARTMENT(HEWEY, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - M. Grant Deposition Transcript
Thursday, May 01, 2025
102 102 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 12:26 PM
PROCEDURAL ORDER. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/01 12:30 PM
Set Deadlines: Per Order #102, Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Authority (ECF No. 101) due by 5/15/2025. (MFS)
Related: [-]