Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Case #: 1:23-cv-00201
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:May 23, 2023
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Case in other court:172nd Judicial District Court, E-210801
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 4:09 AM CST
Claimant
Marshall Riendau
Represented By
Brian A Beckcom
Vujasinovic & Beckcom, PLLC
contact info
Matthew Joseph Kita
Matthew Kita - Attorney At Law
contact info
Petitioner
Marine Fueling Service Inc
Represented By
Michael Keith Eaves
Calvert Eaves Clarke & Stelly, LLP
contact info
Alex Joseph Stelly, Jr
Calvert Eaves Clarke & Stelly, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Sealed Motion Fri 05/09 11:42 AM
ORDER granting28 Sealed Motion to Release Funds. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/9/2025. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
28 28 motion Sealed Motion Wed 05/07 4:01 PM
SEALED MOTION for Request for Release of Security Bond by Michael K. Eaves, Esq. on behalf of Marine Fueling Service Inc (SMH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/06 4:24 PM
ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Parties shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs. It is further ORDERED that all pending motions filed herein are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/6/2024. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
26 26 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/05 4:35 PM
AGREED MOTION Final Take-Nothing Judgment and Entry of Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by Marine Fueling Service Inc.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Final Take-Nothing Judgment and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Thursday, February 01, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 02/01 2:36 PM
ORDERED that all Parties or their counsel shall submit to the Court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of this Court on or before March 1, 2024. Ordered that all Court dates and deadlines are hereby vacated. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/1/2024. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 01/31 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Marine Fueling Service Inc (Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Thu 01/11 3:11 PM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Bench Trial immediately following Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/11/2024. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
22 22 motion Continue Wed 01/10 11:01 AM
AGREED MOTION to Continue and Entry of First Amended Scheduling Order by Marine Fueling Service Inc.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, August 18, 2023
21 21 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/21 8:41 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2024 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Immediately following Final Pretrial Conference - Bench Trial in the Jack Brooks Federal Courthouse, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, TX. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/18/2023. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear Fri 08/18 10:33 AM
PLEASE IGNORE, FILED IN ERROR MOTION for Leave to Appear attorney by Marshall Riendau. (Beckcom, Brian) Modified on 8/18/2023 (ljw, )
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 08/18 8:14 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Docket Correction Fri 08/18 10:49 AM
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 20, Motion for Leave to Appear. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney Brendan Fradkin must be admitted to the Eastern District in order to file a Notice of Attorney Appearance.*** (ljw, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Fri 08/18 11:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 8/18/2023. Court will enter Scheduling Order. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Alex Stelly Jr.; Defense - Brendan Fradkin.(Court Reporter Not Recorded.) (jmv, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 08/16 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alex Joseph Stelly, Jr on behalf of Marine Fueling Service Inc (Stelly, Alex)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/15 5:26 PM
NOTICE by Marshall Riendau re letter brief (Beckcom, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/14 10:44 AM
NOTICE by Marine Fueling Service Inc requesting confirmation of status of Case Management Conference (Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 06, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Lifting Stay Mon 08/07 9:59 AM
ORDERED that the stay previously imposed in this matter is hereby LIFTED and Claimant may proceed with his Jones Act suit in the state court, while the Petitioner retains the right to litigate questions related to the limit of its liability in this federal court, should such litigation be necessary. It is further ORDERED that Claimants stipulations shall remain in full force and effect, and all Parties must adhere to the terms therein. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/6/2023. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/25 11:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION Lift Stay re5 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Marshall Riendau.(Kita, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Stipulations
13 13 respoth Response to Non-Motion Tue 07/25 9:54 AM
RESPONSE to8 Claim of Marshall Riendeau filed by Marine Fueling Service Inc . (Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/13 4:24 PM
NOTICE by Marine Fueling Service Inc of Proof of Publication of Legal Notice(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, July 06, 2023
11 11 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/07 9:45 AM
ORDERED that Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference must occur by July 26, 2023. Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2023 10:30 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/6/2023. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 07/06 7:47 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian A Beckcom on behalf of Marshall Riendau (Beckcom, Brian)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 01, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Sat 07/01 6:30 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Marshall Reindau.(Kita, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 respoth Claim Sat 07/01 5:55 PM
CLAIM by Marshall Riendau. (Kita, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
utility Remark Mon 06/05 3:26 PM
Issued Receipt # 100021713 for $1,000.00 tender of security cost into the Registry of the Court. (bjc, ) Modified on 6/5/2023 (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Deposit Funds Tue 05/30 3:29 PM
ORDER granting4 Limitation Petitioner's Motion to Deposit Funds into Registry. Limitation Petitioner shall deposit $1,000.00 into the Registry of the Court as security for the costs in this matter pursuant to Admiralty Rule F(1) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/30/23. (ljw, )
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/30 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM AND/OR LIMIATION OF LIABILITY. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/30/23. (ljw, )
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/30 3:26 PM
ORDER granting2 MOTION to Approve Order of Limitation and Petitioner's Stipulation of Value, Direct the Issuance of Notice and Restrain the Prosecution of Claims. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/30/23. (ljw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/24 8:50 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Wed 05/24 8:50 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
4 4 motion Deposit Funds Tue 05/23 5:00 PM
MOTION to Deposit Funds Into Registry by Marine Fueling Services.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/23 4:59 PM
MOTION to Approve the Notice of Complaint for Exoneration From and/or Limitation of Liability re1 Complaint, by Marine Fueling Services.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/23 4:56 PM
MOTION Approve Order of Limitation and Petitioner's Stipulation of Value, Direct the Issuance of Notice and Restrain the Prosecution of Claims by Marine Fueling Services.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/23 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability against Marine Fueling Services ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9514934.), filed by Marine Fueling Services.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet