Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Jamar K Walker
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 4:23-cv-00066
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:May 23, 2023
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:31 AM EST
Consolidated Defendant
R&B Corporation of Virginia
Represented By
Jill Heather Fertel
Cipriani & Werner Pc (pa-Na)
contact info
Ernest Frank Koschineg
Cipriani & Werner Pc (pa-Na)
contact info
Alison R Mullins
Cipriani & Werner, P.C.
contact info
Helen Lamphier Fitzpatrick
Cipriani & Werner Pc (pa-Na)
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Mary Brooks
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Joseph Michael Langone
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Jordan Hamilton
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Devon James Munro
Munro Byrd P.C.
contact info
Lynn Toops
Cohen & Malad, LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Veronica Huamani
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Jonathan Shub
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Samantha E Holbrook
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Joseph Michael Langone
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Benjamin F Johns
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Shiree Lackland
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Ra O Amen
Morgan & Morgan Mass Tort Dept.
contact info
John Yanchunis, Sr.
Morgan & Morgan Complex Litigation Group
contact info
Steven T. Webster
Webster Book LLP
contact info
Marcio William Valladares
Morgan & Morgan Complex Litigation Group
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Douglas Monson
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Justin Matthew Sheldon
Breit Biniazan, PC
contact info
Lee Adair Floyd
Breit Biniazan
contact info
Amanda Brooke Murphy
Murphy Law Firm
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Stephanie Moxley
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Michael Hirsh
Hirsh Law Office
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Wendi Moyer
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Michael Hirsh
Hirsh Law Office
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Jason Powers
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Justin Matthew Sheldon
Breit Biniazan, PC
contact info
Lee Adair Floyd
Breit Biniazan
contact info
David Lietz
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Gary M. Klinger
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Michele Van Moppes
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Joseph Michael Langone
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Defendant
R&B Corporation of Virginia
Represented By
Jill Heather Fertel
Cipriani & Werner Pc (pa-Na)
contact info
Ernest Frank Koschineg
Cipriani & Werner Pc (pa-Na)
contact info
Alison R Mullins
Cipriani & Werner, P.C.
contact info
Helen Lamphier Fitzpatrick
Cipriani & Werner Pc (pa-Na)
contact info
Plaintiff
Merrette Blake
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Bryan Lee Bleichner
Chestnut Cambronne PA
contact info
Joshua Lee Jewett
Pierce Mccoy, PLLC
contact info
Bryan L. Bleichner
Chestnut Cambronne PA
contact info
Philip Joseph Krzeski
Chestnut Cambronne PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Pearson
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Jonathan Shub
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Samantha E Holbrook
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Benjamin F Johns
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
70 70 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 01/29 6:55 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2025. (bap, )
Related: [-]
69 69 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Settlement Wed 01/29 4:47 PM
ORDER Granting Plaintiffs'63 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Plaintiffs'59 Motion for Attorneys' Fees is likewise granted. The matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 1/29/2025. (bap, )
Related: [-]
68 68 minutes Fairness Hearing Wed 01/29 4:40 PM
Minute Entry: Fairness Hearing held before District Judge Jamar K. Walker. Plaintiffs appeared through Benjamin Johns, David Wise. Defendants appeared through Alison Mullins, Nellie Fitpatrick (via Zoom), Jill Fertel (via Zoom). Matter came on for hearing re63 Motion for final approval of settlement,59 Motion for attorneys' fees. Comments of counsel and Court heard. The Court GRANTED both motions; final approval order filed in open court. A separate judgment will issue. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR) (bap, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
67 67 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/28 10:39 AM
ORDER granting in part66 Motion To Appear Remotely. Local counsel for the Defendant shall appear in person. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 1/28/2025. (Walker, Jamar)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
66 66 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Mon 01/27 5:14 PM
First MOTION Remote Appearance For Relief by R&B Corporation of Virginia.(Mullins, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memo
65 65 notice Notice (other) Mon 01/27 2:38 PM
NOTICE by Merrette Blake, Veronica Huamani, Shiree Lackland, Douglas Monson, Stephanie Moxley, Christina Pearson, Jason Powers, Michele Van Moppes (Wise, David)
Related: [-]