Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:23-cv-01959
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 23, 2023
Terminated:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 6:19 AM EST
Defendant
TIMOTHY CAMPION
Represented By
Brendan Scott Reilly
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter, P.C.
contact info
FREDERICK M. BREHM
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter, P.C.
contact info
MADISON C. BIERLEY
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter
contact info
Defendant
CHIEF EDWARD BACHERT
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Matthew R Estberg
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
CHARLES F ZURICK, III
Represented By
DONALD E. WIEAND, JR.
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Defendant
CINDY WITMAN
Represented By
Brendan Scott Reilly
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter, P.C.
contact info
FREDERICK M. BREHM
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter, P.C.
contact info
MADISON C. BIERLEY
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter
contact info
Defendant
OFFICER JOSE VAZQUEZ
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Matthew R Estberg
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
OFFICER ERIC TOSAD
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Matthew R Estberg
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
OFFICER RICHARD PENN
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Matthew R Estberg
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
OFFICER RICHARD KRASLEY
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Matthew R Estberg
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
GARREN KNOLL
Represented By
Brendan Scott Reilly
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter, P.C.
contact info
FREDERICK M. BREHM
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter, P.C.
contact info
MADISON C. BIERLEY
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter
contact info
Defendant
BOROUGH MANAGER ERIC GRATZ
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Matthew R Estberg
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
OFFICER STEVEN FRITZINGER
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Matthew R Estberg
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
OFFICER MATTHEW DEVERS
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Matthew R Estberg
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
BARRY COHEN
Represented By
Brendan Scott Reilly
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter, P.C.
contact info
FREDERICK M. BREHM
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter, P.C.
contact info
MADISON C. BIERLEY
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter
contact info
Defendant
BASE ENGINEERING, INC.
Represented By
Brendan Scott Reilly
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter, P.C.
contact info
FREDERICK M. BREHM
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter, P.C.
contact info
MADISON C. BIERLEY
Brehm Nofer & Mccarter
contact info
Plaintiff
EQUINOX PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By
ISRAEL A. SCHWARTZ
The O'Hanlon Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Stephen O'Hanlon
The O'Hanlon Law Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
STELLA CADENTE INVESTMENTS, LLC
Represented By
ISRAEL A. SCHWARTZ
The O'Hanlon Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Stephen O'Hanlon
The O'Hanlon Law Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
EQUINOX ADVANTAGE REAL ESTATE I, INC.
Represented By
ISRAEL A. SCHWARTZ
The O'Hanlon Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Stephen O'Hanlon
The O'Hanlon Law Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SEAN PATRICK BURKE
Represented By
ISRAEL A. SCHWARTZ
The O'Hanlon Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Stephen O'Hanlon
The O'Hanlon Law Firm PC
contact info

GPO Nov 20 2023
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINIONOF 11/20/23. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/20/23. 11/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
GPO Nov 20 2023
ORDER OF 11/20/23 FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE MEMORANDUM OPINION THAT DEFENDANT BASE ENGINEERING, INC., ET AL'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (ECF 25) IS DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT ZURICK'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 33) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ETC. DEFENDANT BASE ENGINEERING INC., ET AL'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (ECF NO. 34) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ETC. FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT BACHERT ET AL'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (ECF NO. 37) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ETC. FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TERMINATE THE CASE AS IT PERTAINS TO DEFENDANTS PENN, VAZQUEZ, TOSADO, KRASLEY AND BASE ENGINEERING INC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/20/23. 11/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
GPO Jun 12 2024
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 6/12/24. 6/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
GPO Jun 12 2024
ORDER OF 6/12/24 FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM/OPINION IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS, CHIEF EDWARD BACHERT, OFFICER STEVEN FRITZINGER, OFFICER MATTHEW DEVERS AND BOROUGH MANAGER ERIC GRATZ'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 76) IS GRANTED IN PART. a. DEFENDANTS' MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO COUNTS I, III AND IV. b. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT BACHERT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AS TO COUNTS III. c. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT FRITZINGER AND DEVERS AS TO COUNT I. d. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT GRATZ AS TO COUNT IV. ETC. THE COURT DECLINES TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS' REMAINING STATE LAW CLAIMS FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION (COUNT II) AND TRESPASS (COUNT V), AND THEY ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BACHERT, FRITZINGER AND DEVERS. ETC. FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT CHARLES F. ZURICK, III (ECF NO. 81) IS GRANTED IN PART. a. DEFENDANT ZURICK'S MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO COUNTS IV. ETC. b. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT ZURCIK AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AS TO COUNT IV.(CIVIL RIGHTS CONSPIRACY). c. THE COURT DECLINES TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS' REMAINING STATE LAW CLAIM FOR TRESPASS (COUNT V), AND IT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ZURICK. FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' NOTION OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 88) IS DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE COURT DECLINES TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OF DEFENDANT ZURICK'S STATE LAW COUNTERCLAIMS FOR PRIVATE NUISANCE (COUNT 1) INVASTION OF PRIVACY (COUNT II) AND THEY ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFFS. FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS, CHIEF EDWARD BACHERT, OFFICER STEVEN FRITZINGER, OFFICER MATTHEW DEVERS AND BOROUGH MANAGER ERIC GRATZ'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE FROM TRIAL THE OPINION TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S PROFFERED POLICE EXPERT TIMOTHY DIXON (ECF NO. 78) IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS, CHIEF EDWARD BACHERT, OFFICER STEVEN FRITZINGER, OFFICER MATTHEW DEVERS AND BOROUGH MANAGER ERIC GRATZ'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE FROM TRIAL THE OPINION AND TESTIMONY OF PLAINTFF'S PROFFERED PSYCHOLOGICAL EXPERT DR. ERIC R. COHEN, PHD (ECF NO. 79) IS DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS, CHARLES F. ZURICK III'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PSYCHOLOGICAL EXPERT ERIC R. COHEN, PH.D. (ECF NO. 82) IS DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT CHARLES F. ZURICK, III'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' ECONOMIC EXPERT ANDREW C. VERZILLI, M.B.A. (ECF NO. 84) IS DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' UNTIMELY FILINGS (ECF NO. 102) IS DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 6/12/24. 6/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 6/12/24. 6/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dt)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 11, 2024
117 117 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Thu 07/11 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re116 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment) filed by STELLA CADENTE INVESTMENTS, LLC, EQUINOX ADVANTAGE REAL ESTATE I, INC., SEAN PATRICK BURKE, EQUINOX PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.. USCA Case Number 24-2237 (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
116 116 appeal Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment) Mon 07/08 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by SEAN PATRICK BURKE, EQUINOX ADVANTAGE REAL ESTATE I, INC., EQUINOX PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., STELLA CADENTE INVESTMENTS, LLC. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number APAEDC-17585216. IFP N (O'Hanlon, Stephen)
Related: [-]