South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-02192
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 22, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:26 AM EST
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as Successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
3M Company
Represented By
Brian C Duffy
Duffy And Young LLC
contact info
Daniel Leslie Ring
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Plaintiff
Jack Aaron Et al.
Represented By
James Edward Bell, III
Bell Legal Group
contact info
Gabrielle Anna Sulpizio
Bell Legal Group
contact info
Randolph Lucius Lee
Bell Legal Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
48 48 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/21 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. AS TO PLAINTIFF ALAN MAHOOD ONLY Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Bell, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
47 47 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/19 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. AS TO PLAINTIFF MARY BRASSELL ONLY Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Bell, James)
Related: [-]
46 46 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/19 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. AS TO PLAINTIFF RUBEN MCNEAL ONLY Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Bell, James)
Related: [-]
45 45 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/19 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. AS TO PLAINTIFF LAWRENCE MASSEY ONLY Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Bell, James)
Related: [-]
44 44 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/19 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. AS TO PLAINTIFF GEORGE CARNES ONLY Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Bell, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
42 42 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 09/09 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Zemender ChatmanAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
41 41 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/03 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Gerald E KlimaAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
40 40 misc Status Report Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/20 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al., Eric Nilson Et al. As to Robert Altenthal, Dean Coleman, Harold Helmig, Mark Steven Minton, John Maynard Schau, David Alan SkinnerAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG, 2:23-cv-02194-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
Monday, August 19, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/19 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Ryan BeckAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to William D Mizell, Frank L Moe, Stephen James Moldenhauer, Steven John Moncur, James M. Mooney, Douglas Moore Jr., Charles L Moore Jr., John A Morak, Jimmy D Morgan, John M Morgan Sr., Kenneth E Morris, John G Morse, Rodney S Corley, Karl W Muller, Michael F. Mulvihill, William James Munizza, John E Munroe, Steven Murphy, Kevin D Murphy, David J. Myers, George H Myles, Charlie P Nance Jr., Mark D Naughton, Carlos A Navarro, Michael Edward Naydan, Kevin D Neal, Gregory Todd Neil, Matecki Cornell Nelson, Ray Nelson, Roland Dwight Nenni Jr., Paul A Nickels, Steven NienhausAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
33 33 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to David Handley, William Thomas Harrison, Michael Angelo Hernandez, Ralph Hernandez Jr, Donald A Hill, Anthony M Holland, Donald A Hooper, Michael House, David R Howard, Bruce G Hulsen, Charles D Hurst, Curtis Jackson, Mark Steven Johnson, Harland D Jones, Kontar Joyner Sr., Gordon Kahanu, Bennie Keith Jr, Roger Copeland Jr, Daniel J Knieriemen Sr, Clay M. Laiche, Maurice Larry LaPalm, Mike Laria, Larry Leo Ligier, Herbert Lopez Jr., Daniel Manning, Fritz A Masch, Ricky J Mcfarland, Oswald Mcglorie, Shawn McKenna, Stephen M Duffy, Robert McPherson, Douglas E Melby, Eugene W. Melnyczuk, Nef Mendez, Julius Menzel, Carl R Merriman, Lester Metze III, Kenneth W Miller, Modica R Miller, Paul Miller, Robert Michael Miller, Thomas Frederick Miller, David D Milliken, James F Millspaugh, Clarence F Mitchell, Gregg H Mitchell, Michael F. Mitchell, Nestor Mitchell, Paul H MitchellAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Tommy Flores Sr., Bruce W Flynn, Michael David Flynn, Randall Dean Fontenot, Orkendell Ford, Tommy Dial Ford, William Harold Ford, Gregory D Foster, Thomas Arthur Galvin Jr., Wade Seers Francis, Armando E Franco, Dennis S Frankenfield, Henry E Franks, Ben J Frascona, William M Fredericksen, James W Frederickson, Don S. Fretwell, Samuel Friar, William L Fricts, Daniel M Fronk, Warren Leroy Frost, Mark Fumagalli, Frank W Fura, Douglas J Fusilier, Joaquin Gaeta, John L Gage, Jerome D Gainer, Robert Joseph Gallagher, Raymond Luciano Gallegos, David L Galloway, Daniel Gamboa, Jerome Garbacik, Javier Garcia, Johnny Garcia, Jerry L Gardner, Mark A. Gardner, Ronald Garland Sr., Lawrence V Garnes, James E Garrison, Arthur D Gasbarro, Robert Joseph Gauthier, Larry Gautreau, Dennis D Gelbman, Michael W. Geller, Andrew Francis-Xavier Gilbert, Patrick Emmet Gillespie, Royce Walter Glenn, William Thomas Gonzales, John Green, Gill HallAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
31 31 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Douglas S Duval, Larry DuVall, Claude B Dyer, Ronald Raye Earl, James O Earles, Russell Gray Eaton, Joseph M Eberhardt, Thomas Walker Eberhart, Jeffery R Eck, John C Eddy, Stephen Glenn Edmison, Travis Edwin Edwards, Robert A Elder, Simeon Eleccion, James J Elie, Roger Brent Elliott, George L Ellis, Sean Allen Elsten, Harold C Ely, Melvin T Ely, Leon M Emerson, Gerard A Ercolino, Joe K Estes Jr., Gary L Evans, James E Evans, Terry L Evans, Dennis E Everhart, Michael Duane Eyberg, Charles E Fairley, Mark T Falzone, Thomas Glenn Fancett, John Farelli, Steve Tilden Farmer, Vincent Farris, Dennis H Farve Jr, Vernell Felder Jr., Bruce E Felker, Randy Knewell Fellows, James J Felter, Michael Lee Fenton, Gerald A Feola, Arthur L Fernandez Sr., Michael Lynn Fickling, Richard Gerald Fifer, Thomas Jon Finch, Steve M Finzer, Christopher J Fisher, Keith Flaherty, William C FlaitzAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Daniel R Crisp, Lawrence Wayne Cross Sr, George A Crouse III, Ronald James Cudger Sr, Eley Cumbess Jr., Samuel Lee Musick, Stephen Allen Cunningham, James J Curran Sr, Vernon Curtis, Earl A Daniel, Donnie H Danieley, James B Darst, Michael Davidson, Alexander Davis, Daniel R Davis, Fred R Davis Jr, George E Davis Sr., Kerry E Davis, Melvin Davis, James E Day, William Howard Day Jr, Aaron J Dean, Jack A Dean, Anthony D Debbs, Michael John DeHamer, Kevin E Delahanty, Edward A Denton III, Stephen David DeSanto, David C Desmarais, Bobby L Dickens, Sean Michael Dickens, James L. Dickensheets, Billie Dickerson, Lance Digangi, William Bennett Dillard Jr, Hybert W Dixon, Kinley Dobson, Ernest M Dollard, Dan Dospoy, Robert Nathan Draper, Steven James Dresen, Paul James Drozik, Benjamin A Dryer, John C Duffey, David B. Duncan, Willie F Duncan Jr., Cody L Dunn, Robert W Duplessie, Ulysses Duran, Jimmy G DurdenAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
29 29 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Michael Edwin Campbell, Mike Campbell, Robert L Campbell, Vincent Ray Campbell, Robert Martin Camplair, Robert Elmer Cantrell, Levi Capers, Stanton Capers, Anthony H Carroccio, Tommy Earl Carson, Richard W Carter, Thomas Brent Casey, Mark Steven Castagnola, Nelson Castro, Edsel L Caudill, Joseph Cennamo Jr., Gary F Chamberlain, Richard A Chaney, Ben J Cheek, Timothy W Chetwynd, William L Chojnacky, Ron Christensen, Tom Christmas, Joseph R Cirafisi, Paul Francis Cirone, James Clark, Theodore V. Clark, Ulyess W Clark, Douglas L Clarke, Keith A Clarke, Dennis R Clay, Lester C. Cochren, Donald W Coger, Dale K Colangelo, John Cole Jr., Victor Lance Coleman, Charles E Colson, Clarence C Conn Jr., James Cooper, Joey J Cooper Sr, Jim Cope, Archie L Corder, Richard Corron, Andrew J Cosenza, Leonard Joseph Costa, Frank Costas, David M Cox, Reginald D Cox, Dale R Craig, Eric J CribbsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
28 28 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to John D Borden II, Bill Borger, Maxton Ray Boskey, Gary W Bowen, Darrel E Bowens, Jon S Bowers, Clinton C Bowman, Seaton Glen Bowman, Mark A Boyd, Ronald Leigh Bradley, Nathaniel Bernard Brailey, Kevin J Brannigan, Sean Othmar Brennan, Steven V. Brewer, Duane C. Bridges, Donald A Brobst, James R Bronner, Bruce V Brooks, Kevin R Brooks, Michael D. Brooks, Paul Orville Brooks III, Aceanyer Brown Jr., Gary W Brown, George W Brown Jr., James M Brown, John R Brown, Keith V Brown, Michael T Brown Sr, Redell Louis Brown, Russell Franklin Brownfield, Lynn Pierce Brownlee, Reginald Ordell Bruell, Walter Waddell Brunson Jr., Mark J Bruzdzinski, Tony Darnell Bryant, Michael R. Bucy, John R Bulpin, Brian L Bunney, Robert Scott Burchardt, James D Burdette, Patrick W Burns, Philip A Burns, Clarence Burruss, Keith A Bush, Vernon R Butler, Calvin Bynum Sr., Willie A. Byrd, Michael Ray Cade, Thomas R Calnan, Edward E CameronAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Rodney Wayne Barth, Berney K Barwick Sr., James R Bathe, Raymond John Bayer, Quintin Onslo Baytop, Thomas S. Beach, Jewell E Beaman, Robert D Beane, Benjamin J Beans, Raymond C Beard, Julian Beasley Jr., James P Beck, Casey D Beeler, Bruce F Begg, James G Beilsmith, Arthur L Bell Jr., David J Bell, Bruce C Benardo Sr., Ronald M. Benion Sr., Galen E Bennett, Michael Edward Bennett, James A Benton Jr, Jeffrey Berning, Ryan Jesse Berry, Ivan D Bertrand, Michael Duane Best, George C Betz Jr., David L Bienvenue, John T Birdsong, Larry Bivens, James B Black, John W. Black Sr., Kenneth R Black, Larry Blacklock, Timothy Allen Blackmon, James A Blackwell, Darryl S Blair, Herman L Blake, Allen Bland, James M Blankenship, Byron R Blanton, David W Boehringer, Guy W Bogisich, David A Bolding, William Britten Bolen, John W Bolstad, Herbert Bond, Willie Henry Booker, Wayne Noel BoomerAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
26 26 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Jack D Aaron, Billy F Adams, Donald Renzy Adams, Bruce William Adas, Carl Edward Admire, David Edward Agar, Robert Thomas Ager, Bobby Gene Agler, Gregory Alan Akre, Arthur Erick Alexander, Carl Alexander, Herbert O Alexander, Parris Alexander, Franklin Jesse Alford, Jonathan Lane Allen, Daniel E Allen, Willard Allen III, Timothy J Alley, Edward Joseph Alsfeld, Wayne Alexander Alston, Connie D Amerson, Louis J Amoroso Sr, Charles P Anderson, James A Anderson, James Anderson, James Herman Anderson, Robert Anderson, Ronald E Anderson, Kenneth Andrews, Bruce Eric Appell, David Arenas, Edwin Arriaga, Robert Arteaga, Thomas Arthur Ashfield, Paul Aszman, Ronald Clinton Atwater Sr, Michael James Ayers, George Kent Baber, Robert L Bagley, Jayson Jacob Balkenberg, William Garnet Ballard, Thomas Balmer, Mark A Balzano, Raymond Reno Balzarini, Mark Anthony Barbour, Robert Lamont Barnett, Robert Nelson Barnette Jr., Scott Elmer Barney, Randy BarthAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/14/2024) (sshe, ). Modified on 8/14/2024 to replace with corrected document, to edit docket text to remove individual plaintiff name no longer listed on Exhibit, as requested and provided by filing user(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
Thursday, August 08, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/08 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs As to 2:23-cv-02192-RMG: Charles F. Brown, Wayne E. Bursey, Rickey L. Burton, Richard Cafiero, Earl C. Carson, Raymond Wilmas Chisom, Harlow B. Cisco, Johnny R. Clayborne Sr., Jack Darty, Charles B. Doolittle, Horace Duffie, Steven Joseph Esposito Sr., David Flowers, Michael P. Fugere, William C. Fulmele, Garfield L. Gibbs, Sant E. Lovett Jr., As to 2:23-cv-02194: Kenneth Nittoly, Rosell Owens, Hal R. Pagel, Larry Reginald Parks, Anthony J. Passalacqua, Douglas A. Pedersen, Jesus Perez, Shauncey D. Perry, Douglas Peters, Anthony J. Petkus, David A. Phillips, Donald S. Picinich, Benjamin F. Pittman, Ronald S. Plante, Michael T. Poindexter, Randall Louis Pomaville, Vernon R. Porter, Leslie F. Powell, Peter F. Prevost, William Jesse Pritchett Sr., Salvatore R. Procida, Steven A. Proctor, Donald A. Pumphrey Sr., Kim A. Quick, Joel Quintalino, Curtis W. Rawstern, Victor Earl Reboy, Joseph F. Remy, and Byron J. RhodesAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG, 2:23-cv-02194-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/08 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Douglas L. Allen, Frank Correia Amaral, Edwin Emmanuel Anderson, Raymond Annicelli, George Atkinson, Rodney Wayne Beck, Robert Edward Betson, Arnett Andus Bracy, William Thomas Brothers, William Rolf Bumgardner, William Henry Carter, Joe Melton Clark, Kenneth Renard Clark, Wayne Alan Clark, Gregory James Coach, Alfred Paul Cozine, Anthony Ralph Cozzolino, Jessie Crawford, James Albert Devaney, Sylvester Dixson, Ralph Thomas Donson, Kevin Michael Dorgan, James Biggs Duncan, Lucian Salvatore Durso, Fred Evans, Charles Langston Faulkner, Glenn Anthony Gabriele, Bennie Leione Harvard, Kenneth Wayne Jack, Josh Knight, Chris A. Kramer, Andrew Sully Lang, Donnie Cole Leak, Carl Hansen Ludwigsen, William A. Luedtke, Richard R. Malott, Chrisopher Alvin Moore, Vernon Lee Moore, Cary Frank Morris, David Ryan Nally, Fred Napier, Patrick Donald Napolitano, Walter Nelson, and Michael Alan NewlandAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
Monday, August 05, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/05 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to Earl Linton Carlton, Wayne Lynn Cartwright, Gilbert Martinez Castillo Jr., Thomas Caziere, Gilbert Lee Chapa, Marc Anthony Chavaree, Edward Daniel Ciezak, Joe Melton Clark, John Terry Collins Sr., Michael Collins, Paul Collins, David Charles Connelly, Bryan Keith Coppedge, Kevin James Cormican, Michael Anthony Cox, Steven Francis Crosby, Anthony Crowell, David Fay Crull, Ronald Dancy, Scott Edward Day, Munro Goodwin Dearing, Terry Rex Deeds, Thomas Michael DeLuca Sr., Stephen Andrew Dileo, Peter Francis Doherty, Manuel Juan Doman, Ralph Thomas Donson, Anthony Quintonia Downey, Jackie Junior Duncan, Kenneth Eaves, Benjamin Franklin Emanuel, Manuel Athony Eneriz, James Michael Fallon, Fred Joe Farner, Roger William Fawcett, Scott Richard Foster, Raymond Michael Fox, Timothy Matthew Fuller Sr., Douglas Galka, Roland Rodriguez Gamez, Willie L Grant, Donnell Reavon Garrett, Shaun Calvin Gary, Gary Amory Gayle, Michael Alex Germain, William Thomas Giannelli, Weldon Gill, Ronald Francis Grondin, and Robert J HeinzAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/05 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. As to James Abbott, Terry Glenn Abney, Joseph Michael Aceto, Winfred Acklin, Clement Joseph Adams, Richard Emory Adams, Charles Dan Addo, Gerald Wayne Allen, Paul David Allen, Wade Anderson, Richard Andrade, Melvin Joseph Armstead Sr., Wayne M. Asue, Jeffrey Bryan Auston, Larry C. Autry, Aaron Banks III, Earl Kenneth Barr Jr., Troy Allan Basham, Andrew Jackson Beard, Curtis Dwayne Beasley, Rodney Wayne Beck, John A. Beckman Jr., Gregory Albert Bedell, Floyd Bedford, Donald Francis Begg II, Randy Keith Belford, Doug James Bianchi, Thomas Wayne Blankenship, Scott Edward Bloomer, George Jacob Bopst, Duncan Eric Boyd, Richard Lee Boyd, Robin K. Bradshaw, Joseph Miller Brubaker II, Marvin Ray Bruun, Wayne Rodney Buckner Sr., Dennis Wayne Burns, Shaun Patrick Caldwell, Ernest Camp, Jerry Allen Campbell, Bradley James Cantrell Sr., and Richard CardilloAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/16 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Decarlos Almon Benton, Joseph Byrd, James Garfield Cagle, Robert Fritzgerald Caldwell, David Arroila Cisneros, Edward Arthur Cowan, Floyd Cullipher, Peter Joseph Ercolino, Jody Gibbons, Narcisco Manzano, and Michael T. Mullany as to Jack Aaron et al., Plaintiffs Andrew Schmitt Sr., Carl Joseph Servat, Edward Ralph Smith, Stanley Sternberg Smith, Robert L. Spillers, Daniel Stevenson, George Allan Stone, Shawn Wilson Weatherly, Michael Allen Taylor, Columbus Huel Thompson, Richard James Turcotte, Anthony Viscomi, and Jeffrey Allen Zimmerman as to Eric Nilson et al.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG, 2:23-cv-02194-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2024) (sshe, ). Modified on 7/16/2024 to edit docket text Related [+] as requested and provided by filing user(sshe, )
Related: [-] move party name no longer listed on document
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, June 06, 2024
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/20 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 12/12 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
11 11 misc Entry Deletion Wed 11/29 11:37 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 9 Reason: Attorney filing user refiled correctly in lead case and spread to applicable member case Corrected Filing Document Number10 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 11/27/2023 (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/28 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02192-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle) Modified on 11/28/2023 to correct filing date(sshe, )
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/27 7:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Aaron Et al. (Sulpizio, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
8 8 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
7 7 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, May 25, 2023
6 6 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 05/25 11:00 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jack Aaron Et al..(Bell, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
5 5 notice Notice Other Tue 05/23 4:43 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. The clerk has entered first listed plaintiff as "Et al." to include all plaintiff parties as represented by plaintiff's counsel. Please see1 Notice of Removal and state court complaint documents for all 799 plaintiff names as listed. See also (attached) Orangeburg County Public Index for case number 2023CP3800538 party listings. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 05/23 4:21 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed Notice of Removal-Orangeburg County Court of Common Pleas)(associated as of 5/22/2023), Jack Aaron Et al. v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02192-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: South Carolina (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 05/23 4:17 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by 3M Company.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 05/23 4:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orangeburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023-CP 38-00538 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11114599), filed by 3M Company.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents