Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael S Nachmanoff
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-00674
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Non-Infringement- Patent Applicant is Dissatisfied with PTO Decision
Case Filed:May 23, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:31 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Katherine K. Vidal
Represented By
Hugham Chan
Doj-Usao
contact info
Counter Defendant
Gilbert P. Hyatt
Represented By
Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Katherine K. Vidal
Represented By
Hugham Chan
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Gilbert P. Hyatt
Represented By
Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 10/18 2:57 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 10/18/2023. (lcre, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
12 12 motion Stay Tue 10/17 12:12 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case by Gilbert P. Hyatt.(DeLaquil, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 12, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 10/12 4:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Gilbert P. Hyatt by Katherine K. Vidal.(Chan, Hugham)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/30 1:38 PM
ORDERED that the Motion8 is GRANTED . Defendant shall have until October 16, 2023 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/30/2023. (tran)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/25 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of Katherine K. Vidal (Chan, Hugham)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/25 2:18 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Katherine K. Vidal.(Chan, Hugham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 17, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 08/17 4:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. Katherine K. Vidal served on 8/9/2023, answer due 10/10/2023.(DeLaquil, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service (U.S. Attorney General),
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service (U.S. Attorney for the EDVA)
Friday, May 26, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 05/26 2:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Katherine K. Vidal, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(show)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
5 5 1 pgs notice Notice (other) Tue 05/23 10:19 PM
NOTICE by Gilbert P. Hyatt (Proposed AO 120 Form) (DeLaquil, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Tue 05/23 10:18 PM
Proposed Summons to the U.S. Attorney for the EDVA by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Tue 05/23 10:17 PM
Proposed Summons to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 05/23 10:16 PM
Proposed Summons to the Attorney General of the United States by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/23 10:15 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8949629.), filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt.(DeLaquil, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 05/26 2:21 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (show)
Related: [-]