J.S., a minor by his Parent and Next Friend, L.S. v. Fairfax County School Board
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Trenga |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00675 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1415 Individuals with Disabilities Education Act |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:31 AM EST |
Defendant
Fairfax County School Board
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J.S., a minor by his Parent and Next Friend, L.S.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 04/24 2:42 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1356 4CCA, case manager T. Fischer, for76 Notice of Appeal, filed by J.S., a minor by his Parent and Next Friend, L.S. (dvanm) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
77 | 77
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
Fri 04/19 8:31 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re76 Notice of Appeal, (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (dvanm) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
76 | 76
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 04/18 7:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to75 Clerk's Judgment,74 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,, by J.S., a minor by his Parent and Next Friend, L.S.. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AVAEDC-9481631. (Belkowitz, Harold) |