Arizona District Court
Judge:Deborah M Fine
Case #: 2:23-cv-00902
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 22, 2023
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 2:57 AM MST
Defendant
Prescott Healthcare Solutions LLC
Represented By
Lisa Anne Smith
Deconcini Mcdonald Yetwin & Lacy Pc - Tucson
contact info
Clayton Robert Kramer
Deconcini Mcdonald Yetwin & Lacy Pc - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
Ondrea Snyder
Represented By
Elizabeth Diane Tate
Elizabeth D Tate Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
33 33 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 12/05 3:29 PM
ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice32 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing this matter with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 12/05/2023. (REK)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 12/05 1:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Prescott Healthcare Solutions LLC. (Kramer, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
31 31 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 11/13 11:28 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle: Settlement Conference via Zoom held on 11/7/2023. Appearances: Attorney Elizabeth Tate is present with Plaintiff. Attorneys Clayton Kramer and Lisa Anne Smith are present with party representative Sarah Toussaint. Discussion is held. A settlement is reached. The parties are directed to file stipulated dismissal paperwork with Judge Fine by no later than December 8, 2023. No Court Reporter is present and no recording is made. Hearing held 1:30 PM to 3:36 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
30 30 minutes Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Tue 10/03 1:51 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/3/2023. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Report. The deadlines are discussed and adopted. Order to issue. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Counsel Elizabeth D. Tate for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Counsel Lisa A. Smith and Clayton R. Kramer for Defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 10:00 AM to 10:13 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KMB)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
29 29 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/03 1:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/31/2024. Dispositive motions due by 7/26/2024. See Order for futher details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 10/3/23. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
28 28 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Mon 09/25 5:36 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ondrea Snyder. (Tate, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
27 27 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 09/19 8:07 AM
ORDER - Video Teleconference Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2023 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 9/18/23. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/07 3:11 PM
ORDER - This matter to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Counsel are directed to contact Judge Boyle's chambers within 14 days to schedule a date and time for the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 9/7/23. (DXD)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Request Thu 09/07 9:16 AM
REQUEST re: For settlement conference by Plaintiff Ondrea Snyder.(Tate, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 31, 2023
24 24 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 08/31 1:00 PM
ORDER - Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 8/31/23. (DXD)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/31 11:57 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Prescott Healthcare Solutions LLC.(Smith, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Tue 08/15 10:44 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and17 Stipulation to Set Aside Entry of Default. The Clerk of Court's Entry of Default (Doc.11 ) is set aside. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Doc.12 ) is denied as moot. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by 8/31/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 8/15/23. (DXD)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc 25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge Tue 08/15 7:01 AM
Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
20 20 misc 25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 08/15 7:01 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
18 18 misc 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline Mon 08/14 6:38 AM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
17 17 misc Stipulation Fri 08/11 3:44 PM
STIPULATION To Set Aside Entry of Default by Prescott Healthcare Solutions LLC.(Smith, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Stipulation to Set Aside Entry of Default
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Fri 08/11 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Anne Smith on behalf of Prescott Healthcare Solutions LLC. (Smith, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
15 15 motion Set Aside Default Thu 08/10 5:47 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default by Prescott Healthcare Solutions LLC. (Kramer, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
14 14 misc Report - Other Thu 08/03 1:51 PM
REPORT of Mailing to Defendant re:13 by Plaintiff Ondrea Snyder. (Tate, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/27 2:12 PM
ORDER - Within 7 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff's counsel shall mail a copy of Plaintiff's Request to Clerk to Enter Default Judgment Against Defendant Prescott Healthcare Solutions, d/b/a Optima Medical (Doc.10 ), the Clerk's Entry of Default (Doc.11 ), and Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Prescott Healthcare Solutions, LLC (Doc.12 ) to Defendant Prescott Healthcare Solutions, LLC, and shall file a notice with the Court reflecting such mailing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 7/27/23. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
12 12 motion Default Judgment Wed 07/26 4:45 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Prescott Healthcare Solutions, LLC by Ondrea Snyder.(Tate, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Ondrea Snyder,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 13, 2023
11 11 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 07/13 8:50 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Prescott Healthcare Solutions LLC. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
10 10 motion Entry of Default Wed 07/12 6:46 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Prescott Healthcare Solutions, LLC d/b/a Optima Medical by Ondrea Snyder.(Tate, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
9 9 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 06/13 7:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for June 26, 2023 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
8 8 misc 25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 06/13 7:19 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
6 6 misc 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b)) Fri 06/09 3:59 PM
ORDER Ondrea Snyder show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
5 5 service Service Executed Wed 06/07 8:47 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ondrea Snyder: Return of Service re: complaint, summons upon Prescott Healthcare Solutions, LLC on 06/07/23. (Tate, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 05/23 11:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Prescott Healthcare Solutions LLC. (BAC)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 05/23 11:42 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21931759. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 23-00902 PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
2 2 service Summons Submitted Tue 05/23 11:40 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Ondrea Snyder. (Tate, Elizabeth) (BAC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/23 11:38 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21931759 filed by Ondrea Snyder. (Tate, Elizabeth)(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1