Original Case: 1:19-cv-00203

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-35352
Typecivil / united states
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Case Filed:May 22, 2023
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 20, 2024 2:51 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
Represented By
Robert P. Williams
DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Amy Collier
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By
Robert P. Williams
DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Amy Collier
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF WYOMING
Represented By
Travis Jordan
Wyoming Attorney General's Office
contact info
D. David DeWald
State of Wyoming
contact info
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee
IDAHO FISH AND GAME COMMISSION
Represented By
Owen Moroney
Idaho Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Represented By
Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Dana M. Johnson
Attorney
contact info
Peter M. K. Frost
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT
Represented By
Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Dana M. Johnson
Attorney
contact info
Peter M. K. Frost
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILDERNESS WATCH
Represented By
Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Dana M. Johnson
Attorney
contact info
Peter M. K. Frost
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
FRIENDS OF THE CLEARWATER
Represented By
Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Dana M. Johnson
Attorney
contact info
Peter M. K. Frost
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/20/2024 2:50 AM PDT
Monday, May 22, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Friends of the Clearwater, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians and Wilderness Watch Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/30/2023. Transcript ordered by 06/20/2023. Transcript due 07/19/2023. Appellants Friends of the Clearwater, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians and Wilderness Watch opening brief due 08/28/2023. Appellees Idaho Fish and Game Commission, State of Wyoming, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and United States Forest Service answering brief due 09/27/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12720388] (JBS) [Entered: 05/22/2023 02:42 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet