First Interstate BancSystem, et al v. Hubert, et al
Original Case: 2:21-cv-00067
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-08038 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 02, 2023 4:18 PM MDT |
Defendant - Appellant
DAVID HUBERT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
NICOLE CHRISTENSEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DONAVAN MCCOMB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JAY MARTINSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JOHN DICK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
KIMBERLEE NEWMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MYRIAH PHELPS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
FIRST INTERSTATE BANCSYSTEM, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
FIRST INTERSTATE BANK
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/02/2023 4:18 PM MDT |
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
[11000765] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/19/2023 Docketing statement due 06/05/2023 for Nicole Christensen, John Dick, David Hubert, Jay Martinson, Donavan McComb, Kimberlee Newman and Myriah Phelps. Transcript order form due 06/05/2023 for Nicole Christensen, John Dick, David Hubert, Jay Martinson, Donavan McComb, Kimberlee Newman and Myriah Phelps. Notice of appearance due on 06/05/2023 for Nicole Christensen, John Dick, First Interstate BancSystem, Inc., First Interstate Bank, David Hubert, Jay Martinson, Donavan McComb, Kimberlee Newman and Myriah Phelps. 23-8038 | ||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
![]() |
||
![]() |