Rajo v. Commissioner, SSA
Original Case: 1:19-cv-03010
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01175 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jun 23, 2023 2:31 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellant
COMMISSIONER, SSA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DEBORAH FERN RAJO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/23/2023 2:31 AM MDT |
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
[11000767] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/22/2023. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 06/05/2023 for Commissioner, SSA. Notice of appearance due on 06/05/2023 Deborah Fern Rajo. 23-1175 | ||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |