Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:23-cv-00676
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Terminated:Jul 24, 2023
Case in other court:Circuit Court for Prince William County, CL23004185
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
Navy Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Elizabeth Mara Briones
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders Llp (dc)
contact info
David Michael Gettings
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders
contact info
Movant
Arthur of the Family Wittenberg
701 loyola avenue, unit 57867
new orleans, LA 00000
Plaintiff
Tenekia L. Harris
4496 Dodds Mill Drive
Haymarket, VA 20169
Plaintiff
Eugene Harris, II
4496 Dodds Mill Drive
Haymarket, VA 20169


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 24, 2023
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/24 2:38 PM
ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED in re3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/24/2023. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
12 12 respoth Objection Fri 07/07 4:34 PM
Plaintiffs' Objection to Courts Lack of Consideration filed by Eugene Harris, II. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
utility Terminate Deadlines Thu 07/06 9:57 AM
Motion Hearing deadline terminated - Per CMH's chambers motion set for 07/06/2023 will be decided on the papers; no oral argument will be heard. (jlan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
11 11 notice Notice (other) Tue 06/27 12:07 PM
NOTICE by Navy Federal Credit Union - Response to Motion to Intervene (Briones, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
10 10 respm Reply to Motion Mon 06/26 1:17 PM
Reply to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Reply in Support of Motions to Dismiss filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Briones, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/22 3:53 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ORDERED that Defendant must file its Reply on or before June 26, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 06/22/2023. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 06/20 7:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Navy Federal Credit Union.(Briones, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
13 13 motion Intervene Fri 07/07 4:47 PM
MOTION to Intervene by Arthur of the Family Wittenberg.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, June 01, 2023
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/01 7:48 AM
Set Deadline as to3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
7 7 notice Notice (other) Wed 05/31 1:51 PM
NOTICE by Navy Federal Credit Union - Notice of Related Case (Briones, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 05/31 1:49 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Briones, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Hearing Date Wed 05/31 1:47 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for July 7, 2023 re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Briones, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
4 4 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 05/31 1:45 PM
Memorandum in Support re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Briones, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/31 1:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Navy Federal Credit Union.(Briones, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 25, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/25 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Gettings on behalf of Navy Federal Credit Union (Gettings, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/24 8:22 AM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8949763.), filed by Navy Federal Credit Union.(Briones, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 05/24 10:13 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (swil)
Related: [-]