Harris, II et al v. Navy Federal Credit Union
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Claude M Hilton |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00677 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for Prince William County, CL23004186 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:55 AM EST |
Defendant
Navy Federal Credit Union
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Arthur of the Family Wittenberg
701 loyola avenue, unit 57867
new orleans, LA 00000 |
|
Plaintiff
Tenekia L. Harris
4496 Dodds Mill Drive
Haymarket, VA 20169 |
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Harris, II
4496 Dodds Mill Drive
Haymarket, VA 20169 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 07/24 2:49 PM
ORDERED that3 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED as to Plaintiffs' RICO claim. For Plaintiffs' remaining state law claims, it is further ORDERED this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for Prince William County, Virginia. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 07/24/2023. (dvanm) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 07/07 4:52 PM
REPLY to Response to8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Eugene Harris, II. (dvanm) |
|
16 | 16
respoth
Objection
Fri 07/07 4:38 PM
Plaintiffs' Objection to Courts Lack of Consideration filed by Eugene Harris, II. (dvanm) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
utility
Terminate Deadlines
Thu 07/06 9:58 AM
Motion Hearing deadline terminated - Per CMH's chambers motion set for 07/06/2023 will be decided on the papers; no oral argument will be heard. (jlan) |
||
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 06/27 12:08 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Briones, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Motion
Mon 06/26 1:20 PM
Reply to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Reply in Support of Motions to Dismiss filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Briones, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/22 3:58 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ORDERED that Defendant must file its Reply on or before June 26, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 06/22/2023. (wgar, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 06/20 7:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Navy Federal Credit Union.(Briones, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Tue 06/20 11:52 AM
Request for More Definite Statement by Eugene Harris, II. (dvanm) |
|
10 | 10
respoth
Objection
Tue 06/20 11:51 AM
Response and Objection to3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Eugene Harris, II. (dvanm) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 06/20 11:45 AM
Notice of Received Documents and MOTION for Extension of twenty (21) days to Respond by Eugene Harris, II.(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Intervene
Tue 06/20 11:40 AM
MOTION to Intervene by Arthur of the Family Wittenberg.(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/08 10:38 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Claude M. Hilton. District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff no longer assigned to the case. (jlan) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/08 11:14 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala no longer assigned to the case. (jlan) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/01 7:51 AM
Set Deadline as to3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. (wgar, ) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 05/31 2:54 PM
NOTICE by Navy Federal Credit Union - Notice of Related Case (Briones, Elizabeth) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/31 2:53 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Briones, Elizabeth) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Wed 05/31 2:52 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for July 7, 2023 re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Briones, Elizabeth) |
|
4 | 4
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 05/31 2:42 PM
Memorandum in Support re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Briones, Elizabeth) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 05/31 2:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Navy Federal Credit Union.(Briones, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/25 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Gettings on behalf of Navy Federal Credit Union (Gettings, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 05/24 9:37 AM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8949924.), filed by Navy Federal Credit Union.(Briones, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 05/25 8:13 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (dvanm) |