Brown v. Unknown
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arenda L Wright Allen |
Referred: | Lawrence R Leonard |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00228 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question Bivens-Prisoner |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 10/23 12:13 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Meko Montez Brown, Jr. re5 and6 . (jmey, ) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 10/02 2:34 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 10/2/2023. (jmey, ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Dismissal Order (1983)
Mon 10/02 2:33 PM
DISMISSAL ORDER. It is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Dismissal Order to Plaintiff at his last known address. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/2/2023. Copies mailed 10/2/2023.(jmey, ) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 08/14 2:39 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Meko Montez Brown, Jr. re3 . (jmey, ) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
4
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/31 11:09 AM
ORDER. If Plaintiff wishes this action to be considered by the Court, he is ORDERED to either (i) remit the statutory filing fee of $350.00 and $52.00 administrative fee ($402.00 total); or (ii) complete and submit both the enclosed in forma pauperis application and the enclosed Consent to Collection of Fees form within twenty-one days of the date of entry of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to please send a copy of this Order, a copy of the Courts in forma pauperis application, a copy of the Consent to Collection of Fees form, and a copy of the document titled, Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint, to Plaintiff Meko Montez Brown, Jr. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/31/2023. Copies mailed 7/31/2023.(jmey, ) |
|
Att: 1 Consent to Collection of Fees and Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit in Support of Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Clerk's Office Acknowledgment of Receipt
Wed 05/24 12:00 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Prisoner (1983)
Wed 05/24 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Unknown (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Meko Montez Brown, Jr.(jmey, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |